UAL, et al v. David Johnson
Petitioner: UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation and UNITED AIRLINES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Respondent: DAVID JOHNSON, individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals
Case Number: 19-8008
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Case transferred from Miscellaneous Docket No. 19-8008. [7000186-2] [7000186] [19-1785, 19-8008] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2019 12:37 PM]
April 23, 2019 Notification from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received (receipt #4624222453). [6999996-2] [6999996] [19-8008] (JR) [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:06 PM]
April 22, 2019 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/22/2019 Miscellaneous Final Order sent to the District Court Clerk. [6999546-2] [6999546] [19-8008] (AD) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:58 PM]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: 1) Petition for Permission to Appeal from Remand Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(1). 2) Plaintiff-respondents Answer to Petition for Permission to Appeal from Remand Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(1). The petition for permission to appeal is GRANTED. The petitioner immediately shall pay the required docket fees to the clerk of the district court. Fed. R. App. P. 5(d)(1). Once the district court notifies this court that the fees have been paid, the appeal will be entered on this courts general docket. Briefing and oral argument in that appeal will proceed as follows: 1) The appellant's brief and required short appendix is due by May 1, 2019. 2) The appellee's brief is due by May 13, 2019. 3) The appellant's reply brief, if any, is due by May 20, 2019. No extensions of time will be granted. Oral argument in this matter will be set during the week of May 28-31 and will be set by separate court order. [7] [6999539] [19-8008] (AD) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:51 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Response in Opposition by Respondent David Johnson Attorney Paul T. Geske to Petition for Permission to Appeal Remand Order Under 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(1). [6][6997884] [19-8008] (Geske, Paul) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:56 PM]
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Paul T. Geske for Respondent David Johnson. [5] [6997573] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-8008]-[Edited 04/12/2019 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Geske, Paul) [Entered: 04/12/2019 09:11 AM]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Petition for permission to appeal from remand order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c)(1). IT IS ORDERED that David Johnson shall file a response to the petition by April 12, 2019. SCR [4] [6994597] [19-8008] (VG) [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:10 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas E. Ahlering for Petitioners United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.. [3] [6993969] [19-8008] (PS) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:43 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ms. Ada W. Dolph for Petitioners United Airlines, Inc. and United Continental Holdings, Inc.. [2] [6993968] [19-8008] (PS) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:41 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) docketed. [1] [6993966] [19-8008] (PS) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UAL, et al v. David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID JOHNSON, individually and on behalf of a class of similarly situated individuals
Represented By: Jad Sheikali
Represented By: Paul T. Geske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED CONTINENTAL HOLDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Ada W. Dolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED AIRLINES, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Thomas E. Ahlering
Represented By: Ada W. Dolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?