Clint Krislov, et al v. Karen Yarbrough, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KIMBERLY M. FOXX, SISAVANH BAKER, DOROTHY BROWN, JESSICA M. SCHELLER, KAREN A. YARBROUGH, COOK COUNTY OFFICERS ELECTORAL BOARD and MEREDITH HAMMER
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL POWERS and CLINTON A. KRISLOV
Case Number: 20-1928
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellants' brief. [ # 12 ] Appellants' brief due on or before 08/10/2020 for Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. Appellees' brief due on or before 09/09/2020 for Sisavanh Baker, Dorothy Brown, Cook County Officers Electoral Board, Kimberly M. Foxx, Meredith Hammer, Jessica M. Scheller and Karen A. Yarbrough. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/30/2020 for Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. CMD [13] [7096622] [20-1928] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/28/2020 10:05 AM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 Motion filed by Appellant Clinton A. Krislov to extend time to file appellant brief. [12] [7096560] [20-1928] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 07/27/2020 05:49 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth Goldstein for Appellant Clinton A. Krislov. [11] [7096433] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1928] --[Edited 07/28/2020 by AP- to reflect the addition of counsel] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:39 PM]
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth Goldstein Clinton A. Krislov for Appellant Clinton A. Krislov. [10] [7096430] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1928]--[Edited 07/28/2020 by AP- to reflect correct filer] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 07/27/2020 02:36 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 Appearance form filed by Attorney Mia Buntic for Appellees Sisavanh Baker, Dorothy Brown, Cook County Officers Electoral Board, Kimberly M. Foxx, Meredith Hammer, Jessica M. Scheller and Karen A. Yarbrough. [9] [7093206] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1928]--[Edited 07/14/2020 by FP to reflect that atty. Buntic is added to the docket.] (Buntic, Mia) [Entered: 07/13/2020 04:28 PM]
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellants' brief. [ # 7 ] Appellants' brief due on or before 07/27/2020 for Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/26/2020 for Sisavanh Baker, Dorothy Brown, Cook County Officers Electoral Board, Kimberly M. Foxx, Meredith Hammer, Jessica M. Scheller and Karen A. Yarbrough. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/16/2020 for Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. CMD [8] [7092933] [20-1928] (CMD) [Entered: 07/13/2020 09:17 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers to extend time to file appellant brief. [7] [7092686] [20-1928] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:34 PM]
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. [6] [7088778] [20-1928] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 06/23/2020 02:23 PM]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellants file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the date that the motion to vacate judgment was filed. The statement is due on or before June 29, 2020. (See order for details) DW [5] [7088734] [20-1928] (ER) [Entered: 06/23/2020 11:53 AM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7088615] [20-1928] (Krislov, Clinton) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:01 PM]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers by 07/02/2020. [3] [7087794] [20-1928] (AD) [Entered: 06/18/2020 10:05 AM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Appearance form filed by Attorney Lyle K. Henretty for Appellees Sisavanh Baker, Dorothy Brown, Cook County Officers Electoral Board, Kimberly M. Foxx, Meredith Hammer, Jessica M. Scheller and Karen A. Yarbrough. [2] [7085345] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1928] (Henretty, Lyle) [Entered: 06/05/2020 11:20 AM]
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers by 06/09/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 06/17/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/13/2020 for Clinton A. Krislov and Michael Powers. [1] [7084820] [20-1928] (AG) [Entered: 06/03/2020 12:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clint Krislov, et al v. Karen Yarbrough, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY M. FOXX
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SISAVANH BAKER
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOROTHY BROWN
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA M. SCHELLER
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN A. YARBROUGH
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COOK COUNTY OFFICERS ELECTORAL BOARD
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEREDITH HAMMER
Represented By: Lyle K. Henretty
Represented By: Mia Buntic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL POWERS
Represented By: Andrew X. Finko
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLINTON A. KRISLOV
Represented By: Andrew X. Finko
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Represented By: Kenneth T. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?