UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, et al v. AbbVie Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO. LTD., AMGEN, INCORPORATED, FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC, PFIZER INC., ABBVIE BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD., SANDOZ, INC, ABBVIE INC., MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMGEN INC. and SANDOZ, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, doing business as BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF LOUISIANA, LOCALS 302 & 612 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS- EMPLOYERS CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND SECURITY TRUST FUND, PIPE TRADES SERVICES MN WELFARE FUND and MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE
Case Number: 20-2402
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 37 Amended Appearance form filed by Attorney Lauren G. Barnes for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [37] [7109820] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Barnes, Lauren) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:56 AM]
September 23, 2020 Filing 36 Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Sobol for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [36] [7109800] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Sobol, Tom) [Entered: 09/23/2020 10:46 AM]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellants' brief. [ # 31 ] Appellants' brief due on or before 10/05/2020 for Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Appellees' briefs due on or before 11/04/2020 for AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd. and Sandoz, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/25/2020 for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. SCR [35] [7108422] [20-2402] (MM) [Entered: 09/17/2020 08:42 AM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 34 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tom Watts for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. for Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. [34] [7108401] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-2402] (Watts, Thomas) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:36 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 33 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott Grzenczyk for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. for Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. [33] [7108400] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [20-2402] (Grzenczyk, Scott) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:32 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 32 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Dena C. Sharp for Appellants Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund and Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company. for Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund. [32] [7108398] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Sharp, Dena) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:15 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 Motion filed by Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund to extend time to file appellant brief. [31] [7108236] [20-2402] (Barnes, Lauren) [Entered: 09/16/2020 01:11 PM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 30 Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Karin E. Garvey for Appellants UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. [30] [7107878] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Garvey, Karin) [Entered: 09/15/2020 02:40 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew Perez for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [29] [7107488] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by FP to reflect that atty. Perez is added to the docket.] (Perez, Matthew) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:36 PM]
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory S. Asciolla for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [28] [7107483] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402]--[Edited 09/14/2020 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Asciolla, Gregory) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:30 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 27 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Sobol for Appellants Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company and Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund. [27] [7106402] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [27] [7106402] [20-2402]--[Edited 09/09/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Sobol, Tom) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:44 AM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Dena C. Sharp for Appellants Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [26] [7105161] [20-2402] (LJ) [Entered: 09/02/2020 11:53 AM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kathryn Swisher for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [25] [7103425] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [25] [7103425] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/25/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Swisher, Kathryn) [Entered: 08/25/2020 01:33 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven J. Horowitz for Appellee Amgen Inc.. [24] [7102076] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2402] --[Edited 08/19/2020 by ER - terminated Attorney Bruce Roger Braun and added Attorney Steven J. Horowitz] (Horowitz, Steven) [Entered: 08/19/2020 01:36 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney William Lavery for Appellee Sandoz, Inc.. [23] [7102054] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [Edited 08/19/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Lavery, William) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:32 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Perry for Appellee Sandoz, Inc.. [22] [7102049] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [Edited 08/19/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Perry, Michael) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:23 PM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Stephen Weissman for Appellee Sandoz, Inc.. [21] [7102039] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [Edited 08/19/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Weissman, Stephen) [Entered: 08/19/2020 12:14 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Damon Andrews Diana Watral for Appellees Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and AbbVie Inc.. [20] [7101728] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402]--[Edited 08/18/2020 by CMD to correct docket text.] [20] [7101728] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/19/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Watral, Diana) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:56 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James F. Hurst Diana Watral for Appellees Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and AbbVie Inc.. [19] [7101727] (L-Yes; E-No; R-No) [20-2402]--[Edited 08/18/2020 by CMD to correct docket text.] (Watral, Diana) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:55 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Diana Watral for Appellees Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. and AbbVie Inc.. [18] [7101723] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [18] [7101723] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/19/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Watral, Diana) [Entered: 08/18/2020 12:52 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Martin Toto for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [17] [7101408] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [Edited 08/18/2020 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (Toto, Martin) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:49 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Carolyn Gurland for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [16] [7101396] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [16] [7101396] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/17/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Gurland, Carolyn) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:36 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert Milne for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [15] [7101381] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [15] [7101381] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/17/2020 by ZNS to reflect the additon of counsel] (Milne, Robert) [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:06 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John Chung for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [14] [7101379] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [14] [7101379] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/17/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition counsel] (Chung, John) [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:56 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas B. Quinn for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [13] [7100707] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [13] [7100707] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/13/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Quinn, Thomas) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:03 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sondra A. Hemeryck for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [12] [7100670] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [12] [7100670] [20-2402]--[Edited 08/13/2020 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Hemeryck, Sondra) [Entered: 08/13/2020 09:05 AM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 Appearance form filed by Attorney Lauren G. Barnes for Appellants Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Additional Parties: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20; Insurance Trust Fund. [11] [7100071] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Barnes, Lauren) [Entered: 08/11/2020 12:54 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [10] [7100021] [20-2402] (Garvey, Karin) [Entered: 08/11/2020 11:02 AM]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 09/21/2020 for Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/21/2020 for AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd. and Sandoz, Inc.. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/12/2020 for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. JNS [7099324] [20-2402] (AG) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:28 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, August 20, 2020 at 1:00p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [8] [7099317] [20-2402] (AG) [Entered: 08/06/2020 04:22 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Brian P. Quinn for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [7] [7099152] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Quinn, Brian) [Entered: 08/06/2020 12:39 PM]
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ian Simmons for Appellee Samsung Bioepis Co. Ltd.. [6] [7099148] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] [Edited 08/06/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Simmons, Ian) [Entered: 08/06/2020 12:30 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7098676] [20-2402] (Garvey, Karin) [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:57 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Karin E. Garvey for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. [4] [7098675] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-2402] (Garvey, Karin) [Entered: 08/04/2020 06:53 PM]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7097484] [3] [7097484] [20-2402] (AP) [Entered: 07/30/2020 04:18 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Kentucky Laborers District Council Health and Welfare Fund, and St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan and Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. [2] [7097337] [20-2402] (CG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 11:01 AM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund by 08/04/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 08/13/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/08/2020 for Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers- Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund and UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund [1] [7097335] [20-2402] (CG) [Entered: 07/30/2020 10:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund, et al v. AbbVie Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: Brent M. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Brent M. Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO. LTD.
Represented By: Brian P. Quinn
Represented By: Ian T. Simmons
Represented By: Martin M. Toto
Represented By: Sondra Hemeryck
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Quinn
Represented By: John H. Chung
Represented By: Robert A. Milne
Represented By: Kathryn Swisher
Represented By: Carolyn P. Gurland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMGEN, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun Esq. I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC
Represented By: Kimball R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: John J. Hamill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABBVIE BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD.
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Damon C. Andrews
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDOZ, INC
Represented By: Christopher J. Letkewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABBVIE INC.
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Damon C. Andrews
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMGEN INC.
Represented By: Steven J. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: Christopher J. Letkewicz
Represented By: Michael J. Perry
Represented By: William Connor Lavery
Represented By: Stephen Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Tom Sobol
Represented By: Matthew Perez Esq.
Represented By: Gregory S. Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISIANA HEALTH SERVICE & INDEMNITY COMPANY, doing business as BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Tom Sobol
Represented By: Matthew Perez Esq.
Represented By: Gregory S. Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOCALS 302 & 612 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS- EMPLOYERS CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY HEALTH AND SECURITY TRUST FUND
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Tom Sobol
Represented By: Matthew Perez Esq.
Represented By: Gregory S. Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PIPE TRADES SERVICES MN WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Tom Sobol
Represented By: Matthew Perez Esq.
Represented By: Gregory S. Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Lauren G. Barnes
Represented By: Tom Sobol
Represented By: Matthew Perez Esq.
Represented By: Gregory S. Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?