Timothy Tyler, et al v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHANIE M. TYLER and TIMOTHY R. TYLER
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC. and BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Case Number: 20-2578
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 09/09/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7106529-2] [7106529] [20-2578] (ER) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:20 PM]
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal. This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to F.R.A.P. 42(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [ # 3 ][4][7106522] [20-2578] (ER) [Entered: 09/09/2020 03:12 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Motion filed by Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler to dismiss appeal. [3] [7106447] [20-2578] (AD) [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:24 PM]
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7103166] DW Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler by 09/09/2020. [2] [7103166] [20-2578] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 04:30 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler by 08/26/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 09/03/2020. Appellants' brief due on or before 09/29/2020 for Stephanie M. Tyler and Timothy R. Tyler. [1] [7102590] [20-2578] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/21/2020 10:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Timothy Tyler, et al v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHANIE M. TYLER
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY R. TYLER
Represented By: Timothy R. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Represented By: Natalie Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RESIDENTIAL CREDIT SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Natalie Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?