Maurice Jackson v. Leonta Jackson, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DENVER HEDRICK, LEONTA JACKSON, Warden, JOHN BALDWIN, TODD PUNKE and SANDRA BOECKMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: MAURICE A. JACKSON
Case Number: 20-2705
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Maurice A. Jackson leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 10/21/2020. [6] [7116199] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 11/20/2020 [20-2705] (CAH) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:48 AM]
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Motion to correct. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending before the district court. Also, the district courts docket reflects that the appellant filed a transcript information sheet on September 4, 2020. Accordingly, the appellant has no pending deadlines. [5] [7109441] CMD [20-2705] (ER) [Entered: 09/22/2020 09:16 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Maurice A. Jackson. [4] [7109355] [20-2705] (MAN) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:15 PM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Maurice A. Jackson to correct. [3] [7109353] [20-2705] (MAN) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:14 PM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Emily ruskin, Ann Lahr, Correctional Officer Juarez and Teri Kennedy. [2] [7106382] [20-2705] (ER) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:24 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 09/22/2020. [1] [7106376] [20-2705] (ER) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Maurice Jackson v. Leonta Jackson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENVER HEDRICK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BALDWIN
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TODD PUNKE
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA BOECKMAN
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MAURICE A. JACKSON
Represented By: Maurice A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?