Victor Robinson v. Sandra McArdle, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SANDRA MCARDLE and JOLINDA WATERMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: VICTOR L. ROBINSON
Case Number: 20-3176
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Victor L. Robinson leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 12/17/2020. District Court has assessed a $1.46 initial partial filing fee. [4] [7131695] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 01/08/2021. [20-3176] (CAH) [Entered: 01/04/2021 11:30 AM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Victor L. Robinson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7121537] [20-3176] (AP) [Entered: 11/13/2020 10:39 AM]
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellee Sandra McArdle. [2] [7121049] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-3176] --[Edited 11/12/2020 by AP- to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 11/11/2020 11:02 AM]
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 11/23/2020. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Victor L. Robinson by 11/16/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 12/09/2020. [1] [7120584] [20-3176] (FP) [Entered: 11/09/2020 04:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victor Robinson v. Sandra McArdle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA MCARDLE
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOLINDA WATERMAN
Represented By: Eliot Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR L. ROBINSON
Represented By: Victor L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?