Marcellous Walker v. Sandra McArdle, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARCELLOUS L. WALKER
Defendant / Appellee: SANDRA MCARDLE and MAXIM PHYSICIAN RESOURCES
Case Number: 20-3214
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Marcellous L. Walker. Disk not required. [6] [7130313] [20-3214] (LJ) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:05 PM]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/13/2021 for Marcellous L. Walker. Appellee's brief due on or before 02/12/2021 for Maxim Physician Resources and Sandra McArdle. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 03/05/2021 for Appellant Marcellous L. Walker [5] [7128272] [20-3214] (CM) [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:00 PM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [4][7126401] [20-3214] (CM) [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:14 PM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Marcellous L. Walker. [3] [7123738] [20-3214] (CM) [Entered: 11/24/2020 10:24 AM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellees Sandra McArdle and Maxim Physician Resources. [2] [7123588] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-3214] [2] [7123588] [20-3214]--[Edited 11/23/2020 by ZNS to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:27 PM]
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing statement filed. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 12/14/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 11/27/2020. [1] [7121835] [20-3214] (AG) [Entered: 11/16/2020 10:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcellous Walker v. Sandra McArdle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCELLOUS L. WALKER
Represented By: Marcellous L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA MCARDLE
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAXIM PHYSICIAN RESOURCES
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?