Leroy Jenkins v. Jacqueline Lashbrook, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JACQULINE LASHBROOK, FRANK LAWRENCE and JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEROY JENKINS
Case Number: 20-3323
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 12/28/2020 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7130750-2] [7130750] [20-3323] (FP) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:56 AM]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Motion to withdraw the current appeal, filed on 12/23/2020. This appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to FRAP 42(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [9][7130738] [20-3323] (FP) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:36 AM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Leroy Jenkins to withdraw the current appeal. [8] [7130629] [20-3323] (CM) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:26 PM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Leroy Jenkins. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7129699] [20-3323] (MAN) [Entered: 12/18/2020 02:51 PM]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the court is a letter filed by the appellant on December 11, 2020. This appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). A review of the docket indicates that on December 2, 2020, the district court granted the appellants motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and assessed an initial partial filing fee of $11.56. The appellant paid this initial partial filing fee on December 8, 2020. To the extent that the appellant seeks an extension of time to file the transcript information sheet, the appellant shall file the transcript information sheet, if one is necessary, by January 15, 2021. The clerk shall send the appellant a transcript information sheet form. Based on a review of the district courts docket, however, it appears no hearings were held. CMD [6] [7128903] [20-3323] (CG) [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:07 AM]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7128475] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Leroy Jenkins by 12/29/2020. DW [5] [7128475] [20-3323] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:19 AM]
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 Filed letter from Appellant Leroy Jenkins regarding DC filings/appeal. [4] [7128049] [20-3323] (MAN) [Entered: 12/14/2020 08:30 AM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Leroy Jenkins. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7127737] [20-3323] (DRS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 07:33 AM]
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 ***PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT PARTIAL FILING FEE. Received: $11.56 from Appellant Leroy Jenkins on 12/08/2020. [2] [7126960] [20-3323] (CM) [Entered: 12/08/2020 03:09 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Date IFP granted: 12/02/2020, plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $11.56. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Leroy Jenkins by 12/08/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 12/15/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 12/31/2020. [1] [7125363] [20-3323] [1] [7125363] [20-3323] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Leroy Jenkins v. Jacqueline Lashbrook, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQULINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK LAWRENCE
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEROY JENKINS
Represented By: Leroy Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?