Matthew Sanchez, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MATTHEW SANCHEZ, DOUGLAS E. WALKER, JONAS DELAGRANGE, TIANNA SANCHEZ and DANIEL W. SEESSENGOOD
Defendant / Appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP, JOHN G. ROBERTS, JR., WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States, NANCY PELOSI, CHARLES E. GRASSLEY and JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 20-3383
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 01/21/2021 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7136101-2] [7136101] [20-3383] (AD) [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:22 PM]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(c). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [6] [7136089] [20-3383] (AD) [Entered: 01/21/2021 03:11 PM]
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Appellee William P. Barr in 20-3383 substituted by Appellee Jeffrey A. Rosen in 20-3383, pursuant to FRAP 43(c). [5] [7133415] [20-3383] (CMD) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:29 PM]
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellants Jonas Delagrange, Matthew Sanchez, Tianna Sanchez, Daniel W. Seessengood and Douglas E. Walker is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellants Jonas Delagrange, Matthew Sanchez, Tianna Sanchez, Daniel W. Seessengood and Douglas E. Walker by 01/06/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 2484. [4] [7130428] [20-3383] (AD) [Entered: 12/23/2020 10:39 AM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7127401] (Note: The Office of the US Attorney has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [20-3383] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/09/2020 05:08 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: John McClain, Roy B. Seessengood, Stephan Delegrange, Samuel A. Zook, Jacob Delegrange, and Marvin Wickey.[2] [7127400] [20-3383] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/09/2020 05:04 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Jonas Delagrange, Matthew Sanchez, Tianna Sanchez, Daniel W. Seessengood and Douglas E. Walker by 12/14/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 12/23/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 01/19/2021 for Jonas Delagrange, Matthew Sanchez, Tianna Sanchez, Daniel W. Seessengood and Douglas E. Walker. [1] [7127395] [20-3383] (ZNS) [Entered: 12/09/2020 04:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Matthew Sanchez, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW SANCHEZ
Represented By: Matthew Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOUGLAS E. WALKER
Represented By: Douglas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONAS DELAGRANGE
Represented By: Jonas Delagrange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIANNA SANCHEZ
Represented By: Tianna Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL W. SEESSENGOOD
Represented By: Daniel W. Seessengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD J. TRUMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN G. ROBERTS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY PELOSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES E. GRASSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY A. ROSEN, Acting Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?