Andrea Santiago v. City of Chicago
Plaintiff / Appellee: ANDREA SANTIAGO
Defendant / Appellant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 20-3522
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 4 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 03/10/2021 for City of Chicago. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/09/2021 for Andrea Santiago. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/30/2021 for Appellant City of Chicago. CMD [6] [7139141] [20-3522] (ZNS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 08:50 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jacie C. Zolna for Appellee Andrea Santiago. [5] [7138423] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3522] (Zolna, Jacie) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:57 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 Motion filed by Appellant City of Chicago to extend time to file appellant brief. [4] [7138382] [20-3522] (Morales-Doyle, Patrick) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:29 AM]
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Patrick Morales-Doyle for party(s) Appellant City of Chicago, in case 20-3522 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patrick Morales-Doyle for Appellant City of Chicago. [3] [7138333] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3522]--[Edited 02/01/2021 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Morales-Doyle, Patrick) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:55 PM]
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant City of Chicago. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7131486] [20-3522] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 12/31/2020 11:11 AM]
December 29, 2020 Case transferred from Miscellaneous Docket No. 20-8034. [7131049-2] [7131049] [20-3522, 20-8034] (CG) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:42 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant City of Chicago by 12/22/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 01/12/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/08/2021 for City of Chicago. [1] [7131046] [20-3522] (CG) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andrea Santiago v. City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDREA SANTIAGO
Represented By: Jacie C. Zolna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: James D. Duffy
Represented By: Myriam Z. Kasper
Represented By: Patrick Morales-Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?