Jimmie Miller v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: ROSE LOOS, JOHN BALDWIN, IDOC Dir., JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, ANGEL RECTOR and WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JIMMY D. MILLER and JIMMIE D. MILLER
Case Number: 20-3533
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Jaclyn A. Kinkade for Appellees Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Angel Rector and Rose Loos has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [12] [7139895] [20-3533] (LJ) [Entered: 02/05/2021 02:31 PM]
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Jimmie D. Miller leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. No initial partial filing fee will be assessed because Plaintiff was not incarcerated at the time the appeal was filed. Date IFP granted: 01/25/2021. [11] [7136844] [20-3533] (CAH) [Entered: 01/25/2021 02:55 PM]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. [ # 9 ] The motion is GRANTED. Attorney Patrick E. Foppe may withdraw from further representation of the appellant. Appellant Jimmie Dale Miller is reminded that he will be proceeding pro se in this matter unless he secures new counsel. This appeal is currently proceeding to a ruling on the appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis by the district court. CMD [10] [7134030] [20-3533] (MM) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:06 PM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 Motion filed by Attorney Patrick E. Foppe to withdraw as counsel for Appellant Jimmy D. Miller. [9] [7133910] [20-3533]--[Edited 01/12/2021 by CG to reflect attorney filer.] (Foppe, Patrick) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:38 AM]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued DENYING Motion to Withdraw as Counsel without prejudice to renewal in a motion that includes a current address for the appellant. [ # 7 ] [8] [7133879] CMD [20-3533] (AD) [Entered: 01/12/2021 09:03 AM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellant Jimmy D. Miller to withdraw as counsel [7] [7133684] [20-3533] (Foppe, Patrick) [Entered: 01/11/2021 02:32 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patrick E. Foppe for Appellant Jimmy D. Miller. [6] [7133678] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-3533]-[Edited 01/11/2021 by VG - to reflect addition of counsel] (Foppe, Patrick) [Entered: 01/11/2021 02:24 PM]
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellees Rose Loos, Angel Rector and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. for Dr. Michael Scott. Additional Parties: Dr. Alberto Butalid, Dr. Nageswararao Vallabhaneni. [5] [7132634] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-3533] --[Edited 01/06/2021 by ER - added Attorney Julie A. Teuscher] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 01/06/2021 11:25 AM]
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: TRANSFERRING the motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis on appeal to the clerk of the District Court for ruling in the first instance. JR [4] [7132431] [20-3533] (MM) [Entered: 01/05/2021 03:54 PM]
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Jimmy D. Miller to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [3] [7132128] [20-3533] (PS) [Entered: 01/05/2021 10:43 AM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Karen Jaimet, Larue Love, Christopher Scott Thompson, Rhonda McWilliams, Derek Flatt, Dr. Louis Shicker, Dr. Steve Meeks, Dr. Alberto Butalid, Dr. Vallabhaneni, Christine Brown and Michael Scott. [2] [7131415] [20-3533] (AD) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:45 PM]
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 01/13/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jimmy D. Miller by 01/05/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 01/29/2021. [1] [7131409] [20-3533] (AD) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jimmie Miller v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSE LOOS
Represented By: Jaclyn A. Kinkade
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BALDWIN, IDOC Dir.
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGEL RECTOR
Represented By: Jaclyn A. Kinkade
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Jaclyn A. Kinkade
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIMMY D. MILLER
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JIMMIE D. MILLER
Represented By: Jimmie D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?