Travis Williams v. Jamie Adams, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JAMIE ADAMS, SANDRA MCARDLE and JOLINDA WATERMAN
Plaintiff / Appellant: TRAVIS D. WILLIAMS
Case Number: 21-1193
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 IT IS ORDERED that Appellant Travis D. Williams show cause as to why this cause should not be DISMISSED for failure to tender the $2.69 initial partial filing fee as directed in the district court's 02/12/2021 order. Response to Rule to Showcause due for Appellant Travis D. Williams by 04/15/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0001 4762 0633. [7] [7151365] [21-1193] (DRS) [Entered: 04/01/2021 03:59 PM]
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Travis D. Williams for appointment of counsel. [6] [7146177] [21-1193] (CAH) [Entered: 03/09/2021 11:55 AM]
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 Appearance form filed by Attorney Colin T. Roth for Appellees Jamie Adams and Jolinda Waterman. [5] [7143333] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1193] --[Edited 02/23/2021 by ER - Terminated Attorney Jennifer Remington and added Attorney Colin T. Roth] (Roth, Colin) [Entered: 02/23/2021 03:35 PM]
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Travis D. Williams. [4] [7141801] [21-1193] (CM) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:25 AM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Travis D. Williams leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 02/12/2021. District Court has assessed a $2.69 initial partial filing fee. [3] [7141185] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 03/15/2021. [21-1193] (CM) [Entered: 02/12/2021 11:07 AM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Teuscher for Appellee Sandra McArdle. [2] [7139701] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1193] [Edited 02/05/2021 by AG to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Teuscher, Julie) [Entered: 02/05/2021 08:40 AM]
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/16/2021. [1] [7138914] [21-1193] (ZNS) [Entered: 02/02/2021 11:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Travis Williams v. Jamie Adams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMIE ADAMS
Represented By: Jennifer Remington
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA MCARDLE
Represented By: John J. Reid
Represented By: Julie Ann Teuscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOLINDA WATERMAN
Represented By: Jennifer Remington
Represented By: Colin Thomas Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAVIS D. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Travis D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?