Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd., et al v. Envision This!, LLC
Defendant / Appellant: ENVISION THIS! LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: BIN TEH HANDICRAFT (SHENZHEN) COMPANY, LTD., A China Coproration and SUNNY HANDICRAFT (H.K.) LTD., A HOng Kong Corporation
Case Number: 21-1579
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: Notice of filing suggestion of bankruptcy of Envision This!, LLC, filed on May 4, 2022. Counsel for the appellant has notified the court that on April 21, 2022, the appellant filed a petition for relief under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Florida. Accordingly, these proceedings are STAYED pursuant to the automatic stay provision of 11 U.S.C. 362. Further, the appellant shall file, on or before August 8, 2022, a status report detailing the progress of the bankruptcy proceeding. CMD. [20] [7234465] [21-1579] (FP) [Entered: 05/06/2022 09:44 AM]
May 4, 2022 Filing 19 Filed Appellant Envision This! LLC notice of intent to file Notice of Filing Suggestion of Bankruptcy of Envision This!, LLC. [19] [7234025] [21-1579] (Letchinger, John) [Entered: 05/04/2022 02:09 PM]
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellees' brief. [ # 17 ] Appellees' brief due on or before 05/16/2022 for Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/13/2022 for Appellant Envision This! LLC. CMD [18] [7231954] [21-1579] (HTP) [Entered: 04/26/2022 10:02 AM]
April 25, 2022 Filing 17 Motion filed by Appellees Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd. to extend time to file appellee brief. [17] [7231867] [21-1579] (Macey, Eric) [Entered: 04/25/2022 05:47 PM]
April 4, 2022 Filing 16 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Envision This! LLC. [16] [7227034] [21-1579] (SK) [Entered: 04/04/2022 08:56 AM]
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Envision This! LLC. Paper copies due on 04/07/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [15] [7226560] [21-1579] (CAH) [Entered: 03/31/2022 12:51 PM]
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 Submitted appellant brief by John S. Letchinger for Appellant Envision This! LLC. [14] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7226519] [21-1579] (Letchinger, John) [Entered: 03/31/2022 11:53 AM]
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/31/2022 for Envision This! LLC. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/02/2022 for Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/23/2022 for Appellant Envision This! LLC RJS [7214557] [21-1579] (AG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 09:23 AM]
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [12] RJS [7157178] [21-1579] (AP) [Entered: 04/29/2021 03:47 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 Filed Response by Appellees Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd. Attorney Eric N. Macey to Appellees' Response to Appellant Envision-This! LLC's Amended Docketing Statement. [11][7154934] [21-1579] (Macey, Eric) [Entered: 04/19/2021 04:59 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Julie A. Johnson-Ahlen for Appellees Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd.. [10] [7154899] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1579] [10] [7154899] [21-1579]--[Edited 04/19/2021 by ZNS to reflect the addition of counsel] (Johnston-Ahlen, Julie) [Entered: 04/19/2021 03:55 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eric N. Macey for Appellees Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd. and Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd.. [9] [7154810] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1579] (Macey, Eric) [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:42 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Envision This! LLC. [8] [7154389] [21-1579] (ER) [Entered: 04/16/2021 09:07 AM]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Defendant-Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. Attorney Eric Macey shall file, on or before April 19, 2021, a response to appellant Envision-This! LLCs Amended Docketing Statement. Counsel is reminded of his obligations under Circuit Rule 3(d). See Practitioners Handbook (2020 ed.) at p. 123. Attorney Macey is also reminded that a corporation is legally incapable of appearing in federal court unless represented by counsel. See, e.g., United States v. Hagerman, 545 F.3d. 579, 581-82 (7th Cir. 2008). [7] [7154057] [21-1579] (AG) [Entered: 04/14/2021 04:13 PM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Envision This! LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7153283] [21-1579] (Letchinger, John) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:28 AM]
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John S. Letchinger for Appellant Envision This! LLC. [5] [7153263] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1579] (Letchinger, John) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:07 AM]
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/24/2021 for Envision This! LLC. Appellees' brief due on or before 06/23/2021 for Bin Teh Handicraft (Shenzhen) Company, Ltd. and Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/14/2021 for Appellant Envision This! LLC. RJS [7152484] [21-1579] (PS) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:18 PM]
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Thursday, April 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [3] [7152481] [21-1579] (PS) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:13 PM]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellant file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before April 12, 2021. (See order for details) DW [2] [7152029] [21-1579] (ER) [Entered: 04/06/2021 08:51 AM]
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/16/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/12/2021 for Envision This! LLC [1] [7151731] [21-1579] (CG) [Entered: 04/05/2021 09:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sunny Handicraft (H.K.) Ltd., et al v. Envision This!, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ENVISION THIS! LLC
Represented By: John S. Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BIN TEH HANDICRAFT (SHENZHEN) COMPANY, LTD., A China Coproration
Represented By: Eric N. Macey
Represented By: Julie Johnston-Ahlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUNNY HANDICRAFT (H.K.) LTD., A HOng Kong Corporation
Represented By: Eric N. Macey
Represented By: Julie Johnston-Ahlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?