Donald Haywood v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DONALD HAYWOOD
Defendant / Appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden, ROB JEFFREYS, NIKKI RAMBO, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. and ANDREW TILDEN, Doctor
Case Number: 21-1678
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald Haywood for appointment of counsel. [12] [7165932] [21-1678] (CM) [Entered: 06/09/2021 03:26 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Donald Haywood. Disk not required. [11] [7163364] [21-1678] (MAN) [Entered: 05/27/2021 02:33 PM]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Letter. [ # 9 ] A review of the docket indicates that the court has not yet received a brief from the appellant. The appellant is reminded that his brief is due on or before June 3, 2021. The clerk will send the appellant a copy of the courts public docket. CMD [10] [7162833] [21-1678] (PS) [Entered: 05/25/2021 03:23 PM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 Filed letter from Appellant Donald Haywood regarding motion for appointment of counsel, appellant brief, the Judge that is assigned, and what the Court has on record. (CH sent copy of public docket sheet 05/25/2021) [9] [7162664] [21-1678] (CAH) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:49 AM]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Letter. To the extent that the appellant seeks recruitment of counsel, he should file a separate motion that specifically makes such a request. CMD [8] [7160251] [21-1678] (AP) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:00 PM]
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 Letter filed by Appellant Donald Haywood. Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald Haywood for appointment of counsel. [7] [7160013] [21-1678]--[Edited 05/13/2021 by AP- to reflect correct filing] (MAN) [Entered: 05/13/2021 09:19 AM]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2021 for Donald Haywood [6] [7157804] [21-1678] (CM) [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:42 AM]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On April 19, 2021, the appellant filed a notice of appeal from the district court's judgment, and appeal no. 21-1678 was opened. On April 29, 2021, the appellant filed an amended notice of appeal with statement of issues and a second appeal, 21-1760, was opened. Both filings seek to challenge the same district court judgment, and two separate appeals are not necessary. Accordingly, appeal no. 21-1760 is administratively CLOSED. No appellate filing fees for appeal no. 21-1760 shall be imposed. SCR [5] [7157294] [21-1678, 21-1760] (CG) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:53 AM]
April 30, 2021 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 04/30/2021 Final Order sent to the District Court Clerk. [7157305-2] [7157305] [21-1760, 21-1678] (CG) [Entered: 04/30/2021 11:05 AM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [4][7156819] [21-1678] (CM) [Entered: 04/28/2021 02:17 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Cheryl Hansen Alyson Burchardt, Kristi Nareto, Heather Cox, Mallorie Kennedy, Donald Doolin, christopher Brubaker, Tracy Doe, Bekah McGrath, C. Coon, Lieutenant Boland, Sergeant Hany, Correctional Officer Towery, Correctional Office Nathaniel Damm, Lieutenant Travis Bantista, Correctional Officer Mary Cerda, Jen Smith, Dr. Mitchell, Correctional Officer Compton, Lieutenant Vilt, Sherry Doe, Sergeant Naretto, Prentice, Lieutenant Sellers, sheron Simpson and John and Jane Doe 1 to 10. [3] [7154859] [21-1678] (ER) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:54 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7154854] (Note: The Office of the IL Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [21-1678] (ER) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:47 PM]
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing statement filed. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/19/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 05/03/2021. [1] [7154846] [21-1678] (ER) [Entered: 04/19/2021 02:38 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donald Haywood v. Wexford Health Sources, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD HAYWOOD
Represented By: Donald Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEONTA JACKSON, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROB JEFFREYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NIKKI RAMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW TILDEN, Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?