Darrian Daniels v. John Baldwin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK and JOHN BALDWIN
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRIAN DANIELS
Case Number: 21-1686
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/28/2021 for Darrian Daniels. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/27/2021 for John Baldwin and Jacqueline Lashbrook. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/17/2021 for Appellant Darrian Daniels [5] [7163481] [21-1686] (CM) [Entered: 05/28/2021 08:58 AM]
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [4][7161423] [21-1686] (CM) [Entered: 05/19/2021 01:20 PM]
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Darrian Daniels. [3] [7156732] [21-1686] (MM) [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:26 AM]
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Darrian Daniels. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7156333] [21-1686] (CM) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:08 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Darrian Daniels by 04/26/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/20/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 05/04/2021. [1] [7155071] [21-1686] (ER) [Entered: 04/20/2021 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darrian Daniels v. John Baldwin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BALDWIN
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRIAN DANIELS
Represented By: Darrian Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?