Chris Njos v. John Coe, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, ANGIE WALTERS, JOHN COE, NICOLE L. MARSHALL and MOHAMMED SIDDIQUI
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRIS NJOS
Case Number: 21-1708
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff-appellant Njos shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be suspended pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7155900] Jurisdictional memorandum due for Appellant Chris Njos by 05/07/2021. DW. [4] [7155900] [21-1708] (ZNS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:22 PM]
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellee represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellees are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellee's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). [7155895] [3] [7155895] [21-1708] (ZNS) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:17 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: John Baldwn and Wexford Health Sources, Inc. [2] [7155608] [21-1708] (AG) [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:38 AM]
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Fee Paid. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/01/2021 for Chris Njos. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Chris Njos by 04/28/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 05/05/2021. [1] [7155603] [21-1708] (AG) [Entered: 04/22/2021 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Chris Njos v. John Coe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGIE WALTERS
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN COE
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICOLE L. MARSHALL
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOHAMMED SIDDIQUI
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRIS NJOS
Represented By: Chris Njos
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?