Donald Jackson v. Robert Carter, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MS. SMITH, NEAL FETZ, KEITH BUTTS, GEO GROUP, INCORPORATED and ROBERT E. CARTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: DONALD L. JACKSON
Case Number: 21-1711
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2021 for Donald L. Jackson. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/03/2021 for Robert E. Carter. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/24/2021 for Appellant Donald L. Jackson [15] [7164829] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 06/04/2021 08:37 AM]
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellee Robert E. Carter. [14] [7164019] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-1711]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by MM to correct type of filing and to reflect addition of counsel.]] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 06/01/2021 01:49 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 13 FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [13][7163714] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:01 PM]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: 1. Letter. 2. Motion for appointment of counsel. A review of the docket indicates that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore all proceedings are suspended pending the assessment and payment of any necessary fees. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 434 (7th Cir. 1997). On May 17, 2021, this court denied the appellant's motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and ordered him to pay the $505.00 appellate fees. Because the appellant has not yet paid the $505.00 fees in the district court, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without court action, in light of the courts fee notice and order dated April 22, 2021. The clerk shall send the appellant a copy of the courts public docket. [ # 10 ] [ # 9 ] CMD [12] [7162720] [21-1711] (ZNS) [Entered: 05/25/2021 11:59 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 11 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [11] [7162662] [21-1711] (MAN) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:49 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson to extend time to file IFP motion. [10] [7162661] [21-1711] (MAN) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:48 AM]
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson for appointment of counsel with memorandum of law in support. [9] [7162620] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:21 AM]
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7162281] [21-1711] (CM) [Entered: 05/24/2021 11:38 AM]
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: 1)Motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. 2) Memorandum in support of PLRA motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Upon consideration of the request for leave to proceed as a pauper on appeal, the appellants motion filed under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24, the district courts order pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) certifying that the appeal was filed in bad faith, and the record on appeal, IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED. The appellant has not identified a good faith issue that the district court erred in dismissing his case for failure to state a claim. The appellant shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days, or this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1929 8647.[7] [7160725] MWR [21-1711] (AG) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:52 PM]
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Donald L. Jackson Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [6] [7159922] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:50 PM]
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 Prose motion filed by Appellant Donald L. Jackson to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7159921] [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 05/12/2021 03:49 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Donald L. Jackson leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/22/2021. [4] [7155767] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/24/2021 [21-1711] (CAH) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:54 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7155761] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:31 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Ms. French, Ms. Owen, Winningham, S. Morris [2] [7155760] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:30 PM]
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Donald L. Jackson by 04/27/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/24/2021. [1] [7155751] [21-1711] (AP) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donald Jackson v. Robert Carter, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MS. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEAL FETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEITH BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEO GROUP, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT E. CARTER
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD L. JACKSON
Represented By: Donald L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?