Corrie Wallace, et al v. John Baldwin, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JEFFERY HUTCHINSON, Warden, ROB JEFFREYS, JACQUELINE LASHBROOK, ALEX JONES, KIMBERLY BUTLER and JOHN BALDWIN
Plaintiff / Appellant: RAFAEL E. SANTOS, JR. and CORRIE WALLACE
Case Number: 21-1883
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Appearance form filed by Attorney Alexandrina Shrove for Appellees John Baldwin, Kimberly Butler, Jeffery Hutchinson, Rob Jeffreys, Alex Jones and Jacqueline Lashbrook. [9] [7173366] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1883]--[Edited 07/16/2021 by MM to reflect termination and addition of counsel.] (Shrove, Alexandrina) [Entered: 07/16/2021 12:11 PM]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. [8] [7170379] [21-1883] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:49 AM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, July 21, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JNS. [7] [7170377] [21-1883] (ZNS) [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:48 AM]
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Rafael E. Santos, Jr. and Corrie Wallace. [6] [7169653] [21-1883] (ZNS) [Entered: 06/28/2021 03:43 PM]
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Rafael E. Santos, Jr. and Corrie Wallace, per order. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7169438] [21-1883] (AP) [Entered: 06/28/2021 09:14 AM]
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 INSTANTER ORDER re: Motion to extend time to file docketing statement. IT IS ORERED that the motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file instanter the electronically tendered docketing statement of the appellants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the transcript information sheet should be filed by July 6, 2021. [ # 3 ]. CMD [4] [7169433] [21-1883] (AP) [Entered: 06/28/2021 09:06 AM]
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Motion filed by Appellants Corrie Wallace and Rafael E. Santos, Jr. to extend time to file the docketing statement [3] [7169075] [21-1883] (Montroy, Christian) [Entered: 06/24/2021 07:37 PM]
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [2][7167505] [21-1883] (CM) [Entered: 06/17/2021 01:13 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Rafael E. Santos Jr. and Corrie Wallace by 05/24/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/17/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 06/01/2021. [1] [7160998] [21-1883] (AG) [Entered: 05/18/2021 12:28 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Corrie Wallace, et al v. John Baldwin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFERY HUTCHINSON, Warden
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROB JEFFREYS
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACQUELINE LASHBROOK
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX JONES
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY BUTLER
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN BALDWIN
Represented By: Nadine J. Wichern
Represented By: Alexandrina Shrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAFAEL E. SANTOS, JR.
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CORRIE WALLACE
Represented By: Christian G. Montroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?