Walter Smith v. Sandra Hautamaki, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BELINDA SCHRUBBE, BRUCE MURASKI, Captain, MICHAEL THURMER, TIMOTHY LUNDQUIST and SANDRA HAUTAMAKI
Plaintiff / Appellant: WALTER SMITH
Case Number: 21-2004
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
August 11, 2023 Walter Smith v. Sandra Hautamaki

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition: Appellant's consolidated brief due on or before 08/23/2021 for Walter Smith. Appellee's joint consolidated brief due on or before 09/22/2021 for Sandra Hautamaki, Timothy Lundquist, Bruce Muraski, Captain, Belinda Schrubbe, Michael Thurmer, Mr. Clover, Michael Meisner, Theresa Murphy, Ismeal Ozanne and William Pollard. Appellant's consolidated reply brief, if any, is due on or before 10/13/2021 for Appellant Walter Smith. DW [7] [7173164] [21-2004, 21-2005] (AP) [Entered: 07/15/2021 02:23 PM]
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 ***PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT PARTIAL FILING FEE. Received: $29.92 from Appellant Walter Smith on 07/06/2021. [6] [7171242] [21-2004] (CM) [Entered: 07/06/2021 04:43 PM]
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 Appearance form filed by Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellees Sandra Hautamaki, Michael Thurmer, Bruce Muraski, Belinda Schrubbe and Timothy Lundquist in 21-2004. [5] [7167477] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-2004] -[Edited 06/17/2021 by AG to reflect termination and addition of counsel] (Schmelzer, Jody) [Entered: 06/17/2021 12:04 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Filed district court order dated 06/15/2021,Because plaintiff seems to have misunderstood that he must pay $29.92 for each appeal, he may have an enlargement of time, to July 7, 2021, to pay the initial partial payment for his appeal in case 14-cv-796-slc (appeal no. 21-2004). If plaintiff fails to make the required payment by July 7, the appeal in case 14-cv-796-slc (appeal no. 21-2004) may be dismissed. [4] [7167238] [21-2004] (CM) [Entered: 06/16/2021 11:26 AM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Walter Smith. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7165415] [21-2004] (MAN) [Entered: 06/07/2021 04:26 PM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Michael Meisner, Robert Tuckwell, Ronald Bayeh, Zakaria Nurdeen, William Pollard, and Kevin Carr. [2] [7163571] [21-2004]--[Edited 06/01/2021 by CMD to include first names.] (ZNS) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:49 AM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. Date IFP granted: 5/27/2021, plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $29.92. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Walter Smith by 06/03/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 06/17/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 06/10/2021. [1] [7163561] [21-2004] (ZNS) [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Walter Smith v. Sandra Hautamaki, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELINDA SCHRUBBE
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE MURASKI, Captain
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL THURMER
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY LUNDQUIST
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANDRA HAUTAMAKI
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Paulson
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER SMITH
Represented By: Walter Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?