John A. Hawkins v. Robert E. Carter, Jr., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN A. HAWKINS
Defendant / Appellee: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR., RON NEAL, CAPTAIN BOOTZ, LIEUTENANT WILSON, OFFICER LUMLEY, OFFICER MEISS, OFFICER HUBBARD and OFFICER REID
Case Number: 21-2228
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to the extent that briefing in this appeal will proceed as follows: [ # 5 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/20/2021 for John A. Hawkins. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/20/2021 for Captain Bootz, Robert E. Carter Jr., Officer Hubbard, Officer Lumley, Officer Meiss, Ron Neal, Officer Reid and Lieutenant Wilson. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/10/2021 for Appellant John A. Hawkins. CMD [7] [7179763] [21-2228] (ER) [Entered: 08/17/2021 04:27 PM]
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John A. Hawkins. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7179653] [21-2228] (CM) [Entered: 08/17/2021 01:50 PM]
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant John A. Hawkins to extend time. [5] [7179652] [21-2228] (CM) [Entered: 08/17/2021 01:49 PM]
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant John A. Hawkins is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant John A. Hawkins by 08/17/2021. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 2978. [4] [7176773] [21-2228] (AD) [Entered: 08/03/2021 10:56 AM]
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant John A. Hawkins leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 07/26/2021. The filing fee is WAIVED. [3] [7175824] [21-2228] (CM) [Entered: 07/28/2021 03:32 PM]
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Robert E. Carter, Jr., Captain Bootz, Lieutenant Wilson, Officer Hubbard, Ron Neal, Officer Meiss, Officer Lumley and Officer Reid. [2] [7171414] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-2228] [2] [7171414] [21-2228]--[Edited 07/07/2021 by ZNS to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 07/07/2021 11:54 AM]
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John A. Hawkins by 07/08/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 07/15/2021.. [1] [7170654] [21-2228] (AP) [Entered: 07/02/2021 10:01 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John A. Hawkins v. Robert E. Carter, Jr., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN A. HAWKINS
Represented By: John A. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT E. CARTER, JR.
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON NEAL
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CAPTAIN BOOTZ
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIEUTENANT WILSON
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER LUMLEY
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER MEISS
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER HUBBARD
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICER REID
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?