IAC/InterActiveCorp, et al v. Adam Roston
Plaintiff / Appellant: IAC/INTERACTIVECORP, ASK MEDIA GROUP, INC. and BLUECREW, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: ADAM ROSTON
Case Number: 21-2501
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 27 Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Scott Atkinson by Appellee Adam Roston. [27] [7218292] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 02/18/2022 01:24 PM]
February 18, 2022 Attorney Scott Atkinson for Adam Roston in 21-2501 terminated. [7218335-2] [7218335] [21-2501] (HTP) [Entered: 02/18/2022 02:59 PM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 26 Case argued by Mr. Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, ASK Media Group, Inc. and BlueCrew, Inc. and Scott Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [26] [7210314] [21-2501] (MLM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 12:15 PM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 25 Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael Y. Scudder, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [25] [7210313] [21-2501] (MLM) [Entered: 01/11/2022 12:14 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 24 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Scott Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [24] [7208594] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 01/04/2022 10:31 AM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 23 Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Mr. Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, ASK Media Group, Inc. and BlueCrew, Inc.. [23] [7208408] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 01/03/2022 02:36 PM]
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel in this appeal shall present oral argument telephonically or by Zoom video communications. No attorneys will be present in the courtroom. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. MOTIONS TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT: Counsel may, not later than 14 days before the argument date, file a motion under Circuit Rule 34(e) to waive oral argument if the appeal can be resolved based on the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument. See FED. R. APP. P. 34(a). Counsel must first confer with opposing counsel before seeking a waiver of oral argument, and the motion must state whether the request is opposed or unopposed. Joint motions are preferred. [22] [7207722] [21-2501] (LJ) [Entered: 12/28/2021 03:38 PM]
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: Defendant-Appellee Adam Roston's unopposed motion for Roston's counsel to present oral argument by video communications. The motion is GRANTED, and attorney Scott E. Atkinson may present oral argument by Zoom Video Communications. Counsel for the appellants will argue in person, in the absence of any separate request. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. [ # 20 ] SCR [21] [7204166] [21-2501] (HTP) [Entered: 12/09/2021 08:37 AM]
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 Motion filed by Appellee Adam Roston to present oral argument remotely. [20] [7203747] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 12/07/2021 01:29 PM]
December 6, 2021 Filing 19 Paper copies of appellant reply brief filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [19] [7203404] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:13 PM]
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Paper copies due on 12/06/2021. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [18] [7202081] [21-2501] (SK) [Entered: 11/30/2021 08:59 AM]
November 29, 2021 Filing 17 Submitted appellant reply brief by LEONID FELLER and MICHAEL B. CARLINSKY for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [17] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7201996] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 11/29/2021 04:15 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 Argument set for Tuesday, January 11, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Room 2721, of the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, 219 S. Dearborn Street, Chicago, Illinois. Each side limited to 10 minutes. [16] [7200620] [21-2501] (CAH) [Entered: 11/22/2021 10:24 AM]
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 Paper copies of appellee brief filed by Appellee Adam Roston. [15] [7198744] [21-2501] (MAN) [Entered: 11/12/2021 11:21 AM]
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 Appellee's brief filed by Appellee Adam Roston. Paper copies due on 11/15/2021 Electronically Transmitted. [14] [7197978] [21-2501] (GW) [Entered: 11/09/2021 09:28 AM]
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 Submitted appellee brief by Scott E. Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7197934] [21-2501] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 11/08/2021 07:01 PM]
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [12] [7191939] [21-2501] (SK) [Entered: 10/14/2021 01:07 PM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Paper copies due on 10/14/2021 Electronically Transmitted. [11] [7190718] [21-2501] (LCP) [Entered: 10/07/2021 03:52 PM]
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 Submitted appellant brief by Leonid Feller and Michael B. Carlinsky for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [10] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7190677] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 10/07/2021 02:42 PM]
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael Carlinsky for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [9] [7190179] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] [9] [7190179] [21-2501]--[Edited 10/06/2021 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Carlinsky, Michael) [Entered: 10/05/2021 06:36 PM]
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott E. Atkinson for Appellee Adam Roston. [8] [7186116] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] -[Edited 09/16/2021 by ER - added Attorney Scott E. Atkinson] (Atkinson, Scott) [Entered: 09/16/2021 12:44 PM]
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steven Friedlander for Appellee Adam Roston. [7] [7185054] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] [Edited 09/13/2021 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Friedlander, Steven) [Entered: 09/10/2021 05:33 PM]
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. [6] [7182302] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/30/2021 02:17 PM]
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/07/2021 for ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/08/2021 for Adam Roston. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/29/2021 for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp RJS [7181288] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/25/2021 09:43 AM]
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, September 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [4] [7181286] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/25/2021 09:41 AM]
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7180599] [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:45 PM]
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Leonid Feller for Appellants IAC/InterActiveCorp, BlueCrew, Inc. and ASK Media Group, Inc.. [2] [7180596] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [21-2501] (Feller, Leonid) [Entered: 08/20/2021 02:39 PM]
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp by 08/20/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 08/30/2021. Appellant's brief due on or before 09/27/2021 for ASK Media Group, Inc., BlueCrew, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp [1] [7179507] [21-2501] (AP) [Entered: 08/17/2021 09:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: IAC/InterActiveCorp, et al v. Adam Roston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IAC/INTERACTIVECORP
Represented By: Leonid Feller
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ASK MEDIA GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Leonid Feller
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BLUECREW, INC.
Represented By: Leonid Feller
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM ROSTON
Represented By: Charles G. Giger
Represented By: Steven L. Friedlander
Represented By: Scott Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?