Joshua Howard v. Belinda Schrubbe
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOSHUA HOWARD
Defendant / Appellee: BELINDA SCHRUBBE
Case Number: 21-3183
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Filed district court order dated 01/04/2022, ORDER granting motion for extension of time. The deadline for Plaintiff to pay the $6.71 appellate initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED to January 26, 2022. [4] [7208544] [21-3183] (CAG) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:01 AM]
December 9, 2021 Filing 3 Appearance form filed by Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellee Belinda Schrubbe. [3] [7204254] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-3183]--[Edited 12/09/2021 by PS - to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Schmelzer, Jody) [Entered: 12/09/2021 10:56 AM]
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Joshua Howard leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 12/02/2021. District Court has assessed a $6.71 initial partial filing fee. [2] [7202949] PLRA initial partial filing fee due by 01/03/2022. [21-3183] (CAG) [Entered: 12/02/2021 02:37 PM]
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Joshua Howard by 11/29/2021. Transcript information sheet due by 12/06/2021. [1] [7201174] [21-3183] (MM) [Entered: 11/23/2021 02:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joshua Howard v. Belinda Schrubbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA HOWARD
Represented By: Joshua Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BELINDA SCHRUBBE
Represented By: Eliot Held
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?