John Thompson v. Aramark Correctional Services,, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN THOMPSON
Defendant / Appellee: ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, DUSHAN ZATECKY, Superintendent, DUANE ALSIP, MICHAEL CONYERS and THOMAS M. RAMEY
Case Number: 21-3360
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Letter. The appellant is again reminded that this appeal was subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore the filing of the notice of appeal triggered the obligation to pay the $505.00 in filing fees. The district court will continue to collect money from the prisoner's trust fund account until the filing fee has been paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Further, any challenge to the amount of money being collected should be made in the district court. [10] [7239965] CMD [21-3360] (CG) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:48 AM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 Filed letter from Appellant John Thompson regarding appeal fee. [9] [7228783] [21-3360] (MAN) [Entered: 04/11/2022 02:33 PM]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re: Letter. The appellant is again reminded that this appeal was subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore the filing of the notice of appeal triggered the obligation to pay the $505.00 in filing fees. The district court will continue to collect money from the prisoner's trust fund account until the filing fee has been paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Further, any challenge to the amount of money being collected should be made in the district court. [8] [7226655] CMD [21-3360] (AD) [Entered: 03/31/2022 04:08 PM]
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 Filed letter from Appellant John Thompson regarding filing fees. [7] [7225740] [21-3360] (CAH) [Entered: 03/28/2022 04:14 PM]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: Letter, filed on 02/25/2022, by the pro se appellant. The appellant is reminded that this appeal was subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore the filing of the notice of appeal triggered the obligation to pay the $505.00 in filing fees. The district court will continue to collect money from the prisoner's trust fund account until the filing fee has been paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). CMD [6] [7220605] [21-3360] (MM) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:57 PM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 Filed letter from Appellant John Thompson requesting clarification on the payment of filing fees. [5] [7220603] [21-3360] (MM) [Entered: 03/02/2022 03:55 PM]
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). The appellant shall remit to the clerk of the district court the $505 appellate fees. Mandate issued, no record to be returned. The appellant has neither paid the $505 appellate fees nor filed a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis in the district court.[4][7217371] [21-3360] (MLM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 01:40 PM]
February 15, 2022 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 02/15/2022 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7217382-2] [7217382] [21-3360] (MLM) [Entered: 02/15/2022 02:21 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin Jones for Appellees Dushan Zatecky, Duane Alsip, Thomas M. Ramey and Michael Conyers. [3] [7208625] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-3360] [3] [7208625] [21-3360]--[Edited 01/04/2022 by AP- to reflect the termination and addition of counsel] (Jones, Benjamin) [Entered: 01/04/2022 11:18 AM]
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Thomas M. Ramey, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7207095] [21-3360] (AG) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:19 AM]
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John Thompson by 01/03/2022. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 01/21/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 01/05/2022. [1] [7207088] [21-3360] (AG) [Entered: 12/23/2021 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Thompson v. Aramark Correctional Services,, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN THOMPSON
Represented By: John Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUSHAN ZATECKY, Superintendent
Represented By: Margo Tucker
Represented By: Benjamin M. L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DUANE ALSIP
Represented By: Margo Tucker
Represented By: Benjamin M. L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL CONYERS
Represented By: Margo Tucker
Represented By: Benjamin M. L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS M. RAMEY
Represented By: Benjamin M. L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?