Rock Hemp Corp. v. Adam Dunn, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROCK HEMP CORP.
Defendant / Appellee: ADAM DUNN, RYAN DAVIES and SHAWN KOLODNY
Case Number: 22-1171
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 14 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [14] [7225227] [22-1171] (LCP) [Entered: 03/25/2022 09:48 AM]
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. Paper copies due on 03/31/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [13] [7225051] [22-1171] (MLM) [Entered: 03/24/2022 01:11 PM]
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 Re-Submitted appellant brief by Attorney Maria D. Sanders for Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7225008] [22-1171] (DelPizzo Sanders, Maria) [Entered: 03/24/2022 11:40 AM]
March 24, 2022 Filing 11 Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [11] [7224978] [22-1171] (MLM) [Entered: 03/24/2022 10:53 AM]
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 Submitted appellant brief by Maria D Sanders for Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [10] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7224971] [22-1171] (DelPizzo Sanders, Maria) [Entered: 03/24/2022 10:37 AM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Megan C. Mirka for Appellees Adam Dunn, Ryan Davies and Shawn Kolodny has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [9] [7223053] [22-1171] (LJ) [Entered: 03/15/2022 10:49 AM]
March 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Nicholas J. DeStefanis for Appellant Rock Hemp Corp. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7222998] [22-1171] (LJ) [Entered: 03/15/2022 09:31 AM]
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/24/2022 for Rock Hemp Corp.. Appellees' brief due on or before 04/25/2022 for Ryan Davies, Adam Dunn and Shawn Kolodny. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/16/2022 for Appellant Rock Hemp Corp. JB [7216152] [22-1171] (CG) [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:52 AM]
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Thursday February 24, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [6] [7216150] [22-1171] (CG) [Entered: 02/09/2022 08:47 AM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Western District of WI, Case No. 21CV497 [5] [7215564] [22-1171] (DelPizzo Sanders, Maria) [Entered: 02/07/2022 08:36 AM]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The plaintiff-appellant shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before February 11, 2022. (See order for further details.) DW [4] [7215456] [22-1171] (FP) [Entered: 02/04/2022 02:17 PM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [3] [7215140] [22-1171] (DelPizzo Sanders, Maria) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:50 AM]
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Maria D. Sanders, Nicholas J. DeStefanis for Appellant Rock Hemp Corp.. [2] [7215139] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1171] (DelPizzo Sanders, Maria) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:49 AM]
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/16/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/14/2022 for Rock Hemp Corp. [1] [7215125] [22-1171] (AP) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rock Hemp Corp. v. Adam Dunn, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROCK HEMP CORP.
Represented By: Nicholas J. DeStefanis
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADAM DUNN
Represented By: Megan C. Mirka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN DAVIES
Represented By: Megan C. Mirka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHAWN KOLODNY
Represented By: Megan C. Mirka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?