Rachael Schmees v. HC1.com, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: RACHAEL SCHMEES, formerly known as RACHAEL BLACK
Defendant / Appellee: HC1.COM, INC.
Case Number: 22-1214
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/21/2022 for Rachael Schmees. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/23/2022 for HC1.com, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 06/13/2022 for Appellant Rachael Schmees. RJS [7220649] [22-1214] (CG) [Entered: 03/03/2022 08:56 AM]
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Rachael Schmees. [4] [7219298] [22-1214] (Blaiklock, A. Richard) [Entered: 02/24/2022 01:30 PM]
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Rachael Schmees. Appellee's brief due on or before 05/04/2022 for HC1.com, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 05/25/2022 for Appellant Rachael Schmees. RJS [7217518] [22-1214] (CG) [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:47 AM]
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday March 2, 2022 at 9:30 A.M. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS [2] [7217510] [22-1214] (CG) [Entered: 02/16/2022 08:43 AM]
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/24/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/22/2022 for Rachael Schmees. [1] [7216511] [22-1214] (CG) [Entered: 02/10/2022 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rachael Schmees v. HC1.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RACHAEL SCHMEES, formerly known as RACHAEL BLACK
Represented By: A. Richard Musgrove Blaiklock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HC1.COM, INC.
Represented By: Carol A. Poplawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?