Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund, et al v. Holli Sullivan, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: INDIANA RIGHT TO LIFE VICTORY FUND and SARKES TARZIAN, INCORPORATED
Defendant / Appellee: HOLLI SULLIVAN, in her official capacity as Secretary of State, INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION, SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, in her official capacity as Vice-chair and member of the Indiana Election Commission, J. BRADLEY KING, in his official capacity as co-director of the Indiana Election Division, ANGELA NUSSMEYER, in her official capacity as co-director of the Indiana Election Division, THEODORE E. ROKITA, in his official capacity as Indiana Attorney General, RYAN MEARS, in his official capacity as prosecuting attorney, ERIKA OLIPHANT, in her official capacity as prosecuting attorney, PAUL OKESON, in his official capacity as Chair and member of the Indiana Election Commission and KAREN CELESTINO-HORSEMAN, in her official capacity as member of the Indiana Election Commission
Case Number: 22-1562
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joseph Maughon for Appellants Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. [9] [7236504] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1562]--[Edited 05/16/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Maughon, Joseph) [Entered: 05/16/2022 03:57 PM]
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellants' brief. [ # 7 ] Appellants' brief due on or before 06/15/2022 for Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/15/2022 for Karen Celestino-Horseman, Indiana Election Commission, J. Bradley King, Ryan Mears, Angela Nussmeyer, Paul Okeson, Erika Oliphant, Suzannah Wilson Overholt, Theodore E. Rokita and Holli Sullivan. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/05/2022 for Appellants Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. CMD [8] [7234354] [22-1562] (CG) [Entered: 05/05/2022 03:30 PM]
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 Motion filed by Appellants Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated to extend time to file appellant brief. [7] [7234208] [22-1562] (Bopp, James) [Entered: 05/05/2022 11:29 AM]
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellee Indiana Election Commission. [6] [7232265] [22-1562] (Howie-Walters, Laura) [Entered: 04/27/2022 12:13 PM]
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. [5] [7228394] [22-1562] (CG) [Entered: 04/08/2022 11:31 AM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Aaron T. Craft for Appellees Karen Celestino-Horseman, Indiana Election Commission, J. Bradley King, Ryan Mears, Angela Nussmeyer, Paul Okeson, Erika Oliphant, Suzannah Wilson Overholt, Theodore E. Rokita and Holli Sullivan. [4] [7228128] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1562]--[Edited 04/07/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Craft is added to the docket.] (Craft, Aaron) [Entered: 04/07/2022 01:41 PM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James Bopp, Jr. for Appellants Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. [3] [7228012] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1562] -[Edited 04/07/2022 by ER - added Attorney James Bopp, Jr.] (Bopp, James) [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:13 AM]
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Courtney Turner Milbank for Appellants Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated and Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund. [2] [7228010] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1562] (Milbank, Courtney) [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:09 AM]
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/20/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/16/2022 for Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund and Sarkes Tarzian, Incorporated. [1] [7227759] [22-1562] (CG) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Indiana Right to Life Victory Fund, et al v. Holli Sullivan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INDIANA RIGHT TO LIFE VICTORY FUND
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Maughon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SARKES TARZIAN, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Maughon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOLLI SULLIVAN, in her official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDIANA ELECTION COMMISSION
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUZANNAH WILSON OVERHOLT, in her official capacity as Vice-chair and member of the Indiana Election Commission
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BRADLEY KING, in his official capacity as co-director of the Indiana Election Division
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA NUSSMEYER, in her official capacity as co-director of the Indiana Election Division
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THEODORE E. ROKITA, in his official capacity as Indiana Attorney General
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN MEARS, in his official capacity as prosecuting attorney
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIKA OLIPHANT, in her official capacity as prosecuting attorney
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL OKESON, in his official capacity as Chair and member of the Indiana Election Commission
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN CELESTINO-HORSEMAN, in her official capacity as member of the Indiana Election Commission
Represented By: Aaron T. Craft
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?