Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Fun F/X II, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant / Appellant: FUN F/X II, INC. and CAO ENTERPRISES II, LLC
Case Number: 22-1933
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 17 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey C. Gerish for Appellee Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. [17] [7246630] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes No) [22-1933]--[Edited 07/07/2022 by PS - to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.]--[Edited 07/07/2022 by CMD to unterminate counsel per counsel's call to clerk's office.] (Gerish, Jeffrey) [Entered: 07/07/2022 01:29 PM]
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: Amended Judgment In A Civil Action dated June 27, 2022, and forwarded to this court by the district court on June 28, 2022. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 08/09/2022 for CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 09/08/2022 for Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/29/2022 for Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. DW [7245482] [22-1933] (ER) [Entered: 06/30/2022 03:09 PM]
June 29, 2022 Filing 15 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bradford S. Moyer for Appellee Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. [15] [7245153] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1933] [Edited 06/29/2022 by ER - added Attorney Bradford S. Moyer] (Moyer, Bradford) [Entered: 06/29/2022 09:51 AM]
June 28, 2022 Filing 14 Filed District Court Amended Judgment dated 06/27/2022. Forwarded to DW. [14] [7245056] [22-1933] (CMD) [Entered: 06/28/2022 03:34 PM]
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: This appeal is REMANDED to the district court to enter a judgment that fully and completely implements its decision, declaring specifically and separately the respective rights of the parties. Further, the appellant shall inform the court, no later than July 8, 2022, whether the district court has entered its amended judgment. (See order for further details.) DW [13] [7244250] [22-1933] (FP) [Entered: 06/23/2022 04:09 PM]
June 23, 2022 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/23/2022 Limited Remand Order sent to the District Court Clerk. [7244258-2] [7244258] [22-1933] (FP) [Entered: 06/23/2022 04:14 PM]
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [12] [7242639] [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/15/2022 11:36 AM]
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John F. Sullivan for Appellee Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. [11] [7242049] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1933] (Sullivan, John) [Entered: 06/13/2022 12:32 PM]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Appellants shall file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the omitted information. The statement is due on or before June 17, 2022.(See order for details). DW [10] [7241974] [22-1933] (AP) [Entered: 06/13/2022 10:24 AM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. [9] [7241811] [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/10/2022 02:30 PM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Edward Eshoo, Jr. for Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. [8] [7241810] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/10/2022 02:30 PM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7241809] [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/10/2022 02:28 PM]
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc. is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc. by 06/24/2022. [6] [7241743] [22-1933] (AD) [Entered: 06/10/2022 11:31 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Jurisdictional memorandum filed by Appellants Fun F/X II, Inc. and CAO Enterprises II, LLC. [5] [7240243] [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:06 PM]
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: Joint motion for voluntary dismissal. [ # 3 ] The parties have asked the court to dismiss this appeal without prejudice. Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) allows an appellant to voluntarily dismiss an appeal. However, once the appeal is dismissed, the appellant cannot reinstate it at a later date. Because it appears that the parties may wish to reserve the right to reopen this appeal, the motion is DENIED. If the appellants do not want to proceed with this appeal, they may file an appropriate motion that complies with Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Any such should be filed by June 16, 2022. CMD [4] [7240040] [22-1933] (CG) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:11 AM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Joint motion filed by Appellants Fun F/X II, Inc. and CAO Enterprises II, LLC for Voluntary Dismissal. [3] [7239969] [22-1933] (Eshoo, Edward) [Entered: 06/02/2022 09:06 AM]
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Appellants and appellee shall file, on or before June 9, 2022, a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, or sent back to the district court as was done in the Philadelphia Indemnity and Greenhill cases. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy this requirement. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) DW [7238883] [2] [7238883] [22-1933] (PS) [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:12 PM]
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc. by 06/01/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 06/09/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/05/2022 for CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc. [1] [7238771] [22-1933] (CG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Fun F/X II, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANKENMUTH MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John F. Sullivan
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Gerish
Represented By: Bradford S. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FUN F/X II, INC.
Represented By: Edward Eshoo Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CAO ENTERPRISES II, LLC
Represented By: Edward Eshoo Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?