Grubhub, Inc., et al v. Relish Labs LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: GRUBHUB, INC. and TAKEAWAY.COM CENTRAL CORE B.V.
Defendant / Appellant: RELISH LABS LLC, KROGER COMPANY and KROGER CO.
Case Number: 22-1950
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 12 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Kroger Co. and Relish Labs LLC. [12] [7246859] [22-1950] (MLM) [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:55 AM]
July 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. William P. Atkins for Appellants Kroger Co. and Relish Labs LLC has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [11] [7246394] [22-1950] (LJ) [Entered: 07/06/2022 03:15 PM]
July 6, 2022 Filing 10 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Kroger Co. and Relish Labs LLC. Paper copies due on 07/13/2022. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/05/2022 for Grubhub, Inc. and Takeaway.com Central Core B.V.. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [10] [7246354] [22-1950] (SK) [Entered: 07/06/2022 02:31 PM]
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 Submitted appellant brief by William P. Atkins for Appellants Relish Labs LLC and Kroger Co.. [9] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7246333] [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 07/06/2022 01:46 PM]
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Shoba Pillay for Appellants Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC. [8] [7245839] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 07/01/2022 06:44 PM]
July 1, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sam E. Iverson for Appellants Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC. [7] [7245666] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 07/01/2022 11:26 AM]
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC. [6] [7241772] [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 06/10/2022 01:13 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [5] [7240254] [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 06/02/2022 08:35 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Friday, June 17, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [4] [7240229] [22-1950] (PS) [Entered: 06/02/2022 04:33 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney William P. Atkins for Appellants Relish Labs LLC and Kroger Company. [3] [7240202] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1950] (Atkins, William) [Entered: 06/02/2022 03:16 PM]
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David H. Bernstein for Appellees Grubhub, Inc. and Takeaway.com Central Core B.V. [2] [7239938] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1950]--[Edited 06/02/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Bernstein, David) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:59 PM]
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 06/10/2022. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC by 06/02/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2022 for Kroger Company and Relish Labs LLC. [1] [7239406] [22-1950] (FP) [Entered: 05/31/2022 01:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Grubhub, Inc., et al v. Relish Labs LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GRUBHUB, INC.
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TAKEAWAY.COM CENTRAL CORE B.V.
Represented By: David Hal Bernstein
Represented By: Stephen A. Swedlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RELISH LABS LLC
Represented By: Shoba Pillay
Represented By: William P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KROGER COMPANY
Represented By: Shoba Pillay
Represented By: William P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KROGER CO.
Represented By: Shoba Pillay
Represented By: William P. Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?