Priest Butler v. Google, LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: PRIEST D. BUTLER
Defendant / Appellee: GOOGLE, LLC, YOUTUBE LLC and ALPHABET INC.
Case Number: 22-2113
Filed: June 23, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Priest D. Butler. [6] [7245265] [22-2113] (MAN) [Entered: 06/29/2022 03:12 PM]
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Priest D. Butler statement of concern. [5] [7245018] [22-2113] (MAN) [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:20 PM]
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Priest D. Butler. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7245017] [22-2113] (MAN) [Entered: 06/28/2022 02:20 PM]
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Priest D. Butler. [3] [7244996] [22-2113] (FP) [Entered: 06/28/2022 01:09 PM]
June 27, 2022 Filing 2 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Priest D. Butler. [2] [7244994] [22-2113] (FP) [Entered: 06/28/2022 01:05 PM]
June 23, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Priest D. Butler by 06/30/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 07/07/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/02/2022 for Priest D. Butler [1] [7244319] [22-2113] (AP) [Entered: 06/24/2022 09:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Priest Butler v. Google, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PRIEST D. BUTLER
Represented By: Priest D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE, LLC
Represented By: Sopen B. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YOUTUBE LLC
Represented By: Sopen B. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALPHABET INC.
Represented By: Sopen B. Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?