Kecia Porter v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: KECIA PORTER
Defendant / Appellee: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2510
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Motion for appointment of counsel [ # 6 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motion for recruitment of counsel is DENIED. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647 (7th Cir. 2007) (en banc); Farmer v. Haas, 990 F.2d 319, 321 (7th Cir. 1993). The panel assigned to decide this case may recruit counsel if it finds that step appropriate after reviewing the briefs. Briefing in this appeal will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 11/18/2022 for Kecia Porter. Appellee's brief due on or before 12/19/2022 for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/09/2023 for Appellant Kecia Porter JPK [10] [7267357] [22-2510] (AP) [Entered: 10/18/2022 03:56 PM]
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 Docketing Statement filed by Appellee USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [9] [7263077] [22-2510] (Dalton, John) [Entered: 09/26/2022 05:07 PM]
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kecia Porter. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7259897] [22-2510] (KRA) [Entered: 09/12/2022 03:05 PM]
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file docketing statement to the extent that the appellant shall file the Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement by 9/23/22. The clerk shall send the appellant this courts instructions for preparing a docketing statement so the appellant may familiarize herself with the information that must be included in a Circuit Rule 3(c) docketing statement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending a ruling on appellants motion for appointment of counsel. [ # 5 ] CDH [7] [7258156] [22-2510] (ER) [Entered: 09/01/2022 02:07 PM]
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Kecia Porter for appointment of counsel. [6] [7258096] [22-2510] (LCP) [Entered: 09/01/2022 11:26 AM]
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Kecia Porter to extend time to file the docketing statement [5] [7258095] [22-2510] (LCP) [Entered: 09/01/2022 11:26 AM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 Filed Certificate of Service to 2022 08 29 Doc #2 - Appearance of John D. Dalton filed on 08/29/2022 by Appellee USAA Casualty Insurance Company. [4] [7257206] [22-2510] (Dalton, John) [Entered: 08/29/2022 11:49 AM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth M. Bartolucci for Appellee USAA Casualty Insurance Company. [3] [7257198] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2510] [Edited 08/29/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bartolucci, Elizabeth) [Entered: 08/29/2022 11:40 AM]
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John D. Dalton for Appellee USAA Casualty Insurance Company. [2] [7257176] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2510] (Dalton, John) [Entered: 08/29/2022 10:57 AM]
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 09/09/2022. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Kecia Porter by 09/01/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/05/2022 for Kecia Porter. [1] [7257050] [22-2510] (FP) [Entered: 08/26/2022 04:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kecia Porter v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KECIA PORTER
Represented By: Kecia Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bartolucci
Represented By: John D. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?