Terry Kass v. PayPal Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRY KASS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, also known as TERRY HORWITZ KASS
Defendant / Appellee: PAYPAL INC., a Delaware corporation and PAYPAL CHARITABLE GIVING FUND, a Delaware nonprofit corporation
Case Number: 22-2575
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 6 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 11/17/2022 for Terry Kass. Appellees' brief due on or before 12/19/2022 for PayPal Charitable Giving Fund and PayPal Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 01/09/2023 for Appellant Terry Kass. CDH [7] [7263981] [22-2575] (CG) [Entered: 09/30/2022 10:20 AM]
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Terry Kass to extend time to file appellant's brief. [6] [7263900] [22-2575] (KRA) [Entered: 09/29/2022 04:05 PM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Terry Kass. [5] [7261130] [22-2575] (CAG) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:43 PM]
September 16, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Terry Kass. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7261129] [22-2575] (CAG) [Entered: 09/16/2022 02:42 PM]
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 10/13/2022 for Terry Kass. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/14/2022 for PayPal Charitable Giving Fund and PayPal Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 12/05/2022 for Appellant Terry Kass [3] [7260303] [22-2575] (CAG) [Entered: 09/13/2022 04:15 PM]
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [7260302] [22-2575] (CAG) [Entered: 09/13/2022 04:13 PM]
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Terry Kass by 09/09/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 09/21/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/21/2022 for Appellant Terry Kass. [1] [7259437] [22-2575] (MM) [Entered: 09/08/2022 04:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terry Kass v. PayPal Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY KASS, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, also known as TERRY HORWITZ KASS
Represented By: Terry Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAYPAL INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Francis H. LoCoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAYPAL CHARITABLE GIVING FUND, a Delaware nonprofit corporation
Represented By: Francis H. LoCoco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?