Froedtert Health, Inc., et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: FROEDTERT HEALTH, INC., FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC., FROEDTERT & THE MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS, INC., COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF MENOMONEE FALLS, INC. and ST. JOSEPH'S COMMUITY HOSPITAL OF WEST BEND, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: FACTORY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2577
Filed: September 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 14 Paper copies of appellant brief and appendix filed by Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [14] [7267618] [22-2577] (LCP) [Entered: 10/19/2022 01:54 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 13 Filed Appendix by Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [13] [7266882] Paper copies due on 10/24/2022 [22-2577] (CAG) [Entered: 10/17/2022 01:05 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. Appellee's brief due on or before 11/16/2022 for Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Paper copies due on 10/24/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [12] [7266881] [22-2577] (CAG) [Entered: 10/17/2022 01:05 PM]
October 17, 2022 Filing 11 Submitted appellant brief by John Vishneski for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [11] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7266872] [22-2577] (Vishneski, John) [Entered: 10/17/2022 12:52 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lauren S. Gubricky for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [10] [7263639] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577]--[Edited 09/29/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Gubriky] (Gubricky, Lauren) [Entered: 09/28/2022 05:07 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John S. Vishneski for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [9] [7263636] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577] (Vishneski, John) [Entered: 09/28/2022 05:04 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jonathan K. Barger for Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company. [8] [7263578] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577] (Barger, Jonathan) [Entered: 09/28/2022 03:36 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth Clark Schirle for Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company. [7] [7263525] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577] [Edited 09/29/2022 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Schirle, K.) [Entered: 09/28/2022 02:51 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Susan E. Lovern for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. Additional Parties: Froedtert Surgery Center, LLC, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center, LLC, Inception Health Services, LLC and West Bend Surgery Center, LLC. [6] [7263474] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577] [6] [7263474] [22-2577]--[Edited 09/28/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Lovern, Susan) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:43 PM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kelly J. Noyes for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. Additional Parties: Froedtert Surgery Center, LLC, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center, LLC, Inception Health Services, LLC and West Bend Surgery Center, LLC. [5] [7263470] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2577] (Noyes, Kelly) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:32 PM]
September 13, 2022 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. [4] [7260249] [22-2577] (Noyes, Kelly) [Entered: 09/13/2022 02:45 PM]
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7260241] [22-2577] (Noyes, Kelly) [Entered: 09/13/2022 02:36 PM]
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLANTS: Froedtert Surgery Center, LLC, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center, LLC, Inception Health Services, LLC and West Bend Surgery Center, LLC. [2] [7259320] [22-2577] (ER) [Entered: 09/08/2022 12:54 PM]
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc. by 09/14/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 09/21/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/17/2022 for Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls, Inc., Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians, Inc., Froedtert Health Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. and St. Joseph's Commuity Hospital of West Bend, Inc. [1] [7259311] [22-2577] (ER) [Entered: 09/08/2022 12:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Froedtert Health, Inc., et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FROEDTERT HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Kelly J. Noyes
Represented By: John S. Vishneski III
Represented By: Susan E. Lovern
Represented By: Lauren S. Gubricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FROEDTERT MEMORIAL LUTHERAN HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Kelly J. Noyes
Represented By: John S. Vishneski III
Represented By: Susan E. Lovern
Represented By: Lauren S. Gubricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FROEDTERT & THE MEDICAL COLLEGE OF WISCONSIN COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS, INC.
Represented By: John S. Vishneski III
Represented By: Kelly J. Noyes
Represented By: Susan E. Lovern
Represented By: Lauren S. Gubricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF MENOMONEE FALLS, INC.
Represented By: Kelly J. Noyes
Represented By: John S. Vishneski III
Represented By: Susan E. Lovern
Represented By: Lauren S. Gubricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ST. JOSEPH'S COMMUITY HOSPITAL OF WEST BEND, INC.
Represented By: Kelly J. Noyes
Represented By: John S. Vishneski III
Represented By: Susan E. Lovern
Represented By: Lauren S. Gubricky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FACTORY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jonathan K. Barger
Represented By: K. Clark Schirle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?