Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company v. Burlington Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellee: ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant / Appellant: BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 22-2688
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kolby R Smithpeters for Appellant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company and Appellees Burlington Insurance Company, Cruse Construction Company, Gaylon Cruse, Mark Duckworth, Douglas Forrest and Southern Truss, Inc. in 22-2683, Appellee Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company and Appellant Burlington Insurance Company in 22-2688. [9] [7272389] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2683, 22-2688] (Smithpeters, Kolby) [Entered: 11/09/2022 10:55 AM]
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: 1. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 222683 on or before December 19, 2022. 2. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the crossappeal docketed in 222688 on or before January 19, 2023. 3. The remaining defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and in the crossappeal on or before February 21, 2023. 4. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the crossappeal on or before February 21, 2023. 5. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its reply brief, if any, in the crossappeal, on or before March 14, 2023. RJS [7269140] [22-2683, 22-2688] (AP) [Entered: 10/26/2022 11:46 AM]
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: 1. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 222683 on or before December 12, 2022. 2. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the crossappeal docketed in 222688 on or before January 12, 2023. 3. The remaining defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and in the crossappeal on or before February 13, 2023. 4. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the crossappeal on or before February 13, 2023. 5. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its reply brief, if any, in the crossappeal, on or before March 6, 2023. RJS [7268876] [22-2683, 22-2688] (AP) [Entered: 10/25/2022 02:32 PM]
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Justin Watkins for Appellees Gaylon Cruse, Mark Duckworth and Cruse Construction Company in 22-2683. [6] [7266472] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2683, 22-2688] (Watkins, Justin) [Entered: 10/13/2022 10:24 PM]
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: 1. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 222683 on or before December 2, 2022. 2. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the crossappeal docketed in 222688 on or before January 3, 2023. 3. The remaining defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and in the crossappeal on or before February 2, 2023. 4. Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the crossappeal on or before February 2, 2023. 5. Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its reply brief, if any, in the crossappeal, on or before February 23, 2023. Counsel for the parties are encouraged to avoid unnecessary duplication by filing a joint brief or a joint appendix or by adopting parts of a copartys brief. Duplicative briefing will be stricken and may result in disciplinary sanctions against counsel. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F. 2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992) RJS [7265134] [22-2683, 22-2688] (FP) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:36 PM]
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday October 28, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [4] [7265132] [22-2683, 22-2688]--[Edited 10/07/2022 by FP to reflect that correct date.] (FP) [Entered: 10/06/2022 01:14 PM]
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas L Buck for Appellant Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company in 22-2683. [3] [7263266] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2683, 22-2688] (Buck, Thomas) [Entered: 09/27/2022 02:30 PM]
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court orders these appeals CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing will proceed as follows: 1.) Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 22-2683 on or before November 1, 2022. 2.) Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 22-2688 on or before December 1, 2022. 3.) The remaining defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and in the cross-appeal on or before January 3, 2023. 4.) Plaintiff Artisan & Truckers Casualty Co. shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before January 3, 2023. 5.) Defendant The Burlington Ins. Co. shall file its reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal, on or before January 24, 2023. DW [2] [7263235] [22-2683, 22-2688] (ER) [Entered: 09/27/2022 01:16 PM]
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 10/06/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/01/2022 for Burlington Insurance Company. [1] [7262581] [22-2688] (MM) [Entered: 09/23/2022 12:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company v. Burlington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARTISAN AND TRUCKERS CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas L. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Rosa M. Tumialan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?