Arun Bhattacharya v. State Bank of India
Plaintiff / Appellant: ARUN KUMAR BHATTACHARYA
Defendant / Appellee: STATE BANK OF INDIA
Case Number: 22-2734
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Briefing in this appeal is SUSPENDED pending resolution of the motion for recruitment of counsel filed by the appellant on September 30, 2022. CDH [10] [7274478] [22-2734] (PS) [Entered: 11/21/2022 10:55 AM]
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Arun Kumar Bhattacharya leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 11/15/2022. [9] [7273514] [22-2734] (CG) [Entered: 11/15/2022 02:47 PM]
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael D. Sloan, Esq. for Appellee State Bank of India. [8] [7268725] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2734] -[Edited 10/25/2022 by ER - added Attorney Michael D. Sloan] (Sloan, Michael) [Entered: 10/25/2022 11:15 AM]
October 18, 2022 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney David R. Wright for Appellee State Bank of India. [7] [7267190] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2734] [7] [7267190] [22-2734]--[Edited 10/18/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Wright, David) [Entered: 10/18/2022 12:24 PM]
October 10, 2022 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie A. Napierala for Appellee State Bank of India. [6] [7265529] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2734] [6] [7265529] [22-2734]--[Edited 10/11/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Napierala, Natalie) [Entered: 10/10/2022 12:37 PM]
October 7, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John Leed Miller for Appellee State Bank of India. [5] [7265283] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2734] (Miller, John) [Entered: 10/07/2022 09:17 AM]
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Arun Kumar Bhattacharya. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7264343] [22-2734] (LCP) [Entered: 10/03/2022 02:09 PM]
September 30, 2022 Filing 3 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Arun Kumar Bhattacharya for appointment of counsel. [3] [7263970] [22-2734] (CAG) [Entered: 09/30/2022 10:06 AM]
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Prose motion filed by Appellant Arun Kumar Bhattacharya to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [2] [7263968] [22-2734] (CAG) [Entered: 09/30/2022 10:05 AM]
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Arun Kumar Bhattacharya by 10/04/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 10/12/2022. [1] [7263708] [22-2734] (AP) [Entered: 09/29/2022 10:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Arun Bhattacharya v. State Bank of India
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARUN KUMAR BHATTACHARYA
Represented By: Arun Kumar Bhattacharya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE BANK OF INDIA
Represented By: John L. Miller
Represented By: Natalie A. Napierala
Represented By: Michael David Sloan
Represented By: David Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?