Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company v. Zhen Lin, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant / Appellee: ZHEN FENG LIN and LI CHEN
Case Number: 22-2858
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Attorney Matthew L McBride III for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2776 and Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2858 terminated, pursuant to attorney notification regarding counsel of record. [7276961-2] [7276961] [22-2776, 22-2858] (JAD) [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:52 PM]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 01/12/2023 for Li Chen and Zhen Feng Lin. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 03/13/2023 for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 04/12/2023 for Appellants Li Chen and Zhen Feng Lin. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 05/03/2023 for Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. JNS [7273002] [22-2776, 22-2858] (AD) [Entered: 11/14/2022 10:36 AM]
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 Amended Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. Appeal No. 22-2776 [8] [7269144] [22-2858] (Murphy-Petros, Melissa) [Entered: 10/26/2022 11:57 AM]
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: 1. Defendants shall file their opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 22-2776 on or before 12/02/2022. 2. Plaintiff shall file its combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 22-2858 on or before 01/02/2023. 3. Defendants shall file their combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before 02/02/2023. 4. Plaintiff shall file its reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before 02/23/2023. DW [7] [7268943] [22-2776, 22-2858] (MM) [Entered: 10/25/2022 04:17 PM]
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Hartford Accident Indemnity Company file a complete statement of jurisdiction that includes the correct date that it filed its cross-appeal. The statement is due on or before November 1, 2022. (See order for details). DW [6] [7268916] [22-2858] (AP) [Entered: 10/25/2022 03:55 PM]
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 22-2776 [5] [7268151] [22-2858] (Duffy, Michael) [Entered: 10/21/2022 02:10 PM]
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael J. Duffy for Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2858, Appellee Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2776. [4] [7268143] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2858, 22-2776] (Duffy, Michael) [Entered: 10/21/2022 02:04 PM]
October 21, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew L. McBride III for Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. [3] [7268072] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2858]--[Edited 10/21/2022 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (McBride, Matthew) [Entered: 10/21/2022 11:18 AM]
October 20, 2022 Filing 2 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Melissa A. Murphy-Petros for Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2858, Appellee Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company in 22-2776. [2] [7267896] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2858, 22-2776] [2] [7267896] [22-2858, 22-2776]--[Edited 10/20/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Murphy-Petros, Melissa) [Entered: 10/20/2022 01:41 PM]
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company by 10/24/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 11/02/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/28/2022 for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company. [1] [7267864] [22-2858] (CG) [Entered: 10/20/2022 12:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company v. Zhen Lin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Michael J. Duffy
Represented By: Matthew L. McBride III
Represented By: Melissa A. Murphy-Petros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZHEN FENG LIN
Represented By: Kent David Sinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LI CHEN
Represented By: Kent David Sinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?