John Andren v. End User Consumer Plaintiff Class
Defendant: FIELDALE FARMS CORPORATION, GEORGE'S INC., GEORGE'S FARMS, INC., MAR-JAC POULTRY, INC., PECO FOODS, INC. and PILGRIM'S PRIDE CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: END USER CONSUMER PLAINTIFF CLASS
Appellant: JOHN ANDREN, Objector
Defendant / Appellee: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Case Number: 22-2889
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re: Objector-Appellant John Andren's instanter motion to file appendix temporarily under seal. The parties shall file within 21 days a response to the motion to seal discussing the appropriateness of maintaining the relevant materials under seal. See Baxter Intl, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 54546 (7th Cir. 2002); United States v. Foster, 564 F.3d 852, 853 (7th Cir. 2009). MRO [18] [7280902] [22-2889] (CG) [Entered: 12/22/2022 12:17 PM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 17 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellant John Andren. [17] [7280874] [22-2889] (KRA) [Entered: 12/22/2022 11:31 AM]
December 19, 2022 Filing 16 Appellant's brief filed by Appellant John Andren. Paper copies due on 12/27/2022. Electronically Transmitted. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [16] [7280275] [22-2889] (LCP) [Entered: 12/20/2022 09:30 AM]
December 19, 2022 Filing 15 Submitted appellant brief by Theodore H Frank for Appellant John Andren. [15] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7280224] [22-2889] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:10 PM]
December 19, 2022 Filing 14 Instanter motion by Appellant John Andren to seal Appendix. [14] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. [7280221] [22-2889] (Frank, Theodore) [Entered: 12/19/2022 09:34 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 Motion filed by Appellant Services Group of America in 22-1994 Substitute Counsel of Record. [13] [7277562] [22-1994, 22-1858, 22-2889] (Aizenberg, Gabriel) [Entered: 12/06/2022 04:11 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Breanna Le Van Engelen for Appellee End User Consumer Plaintiff Class in 22-2889 has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [12] [7276056] [22-2889, 22-1858, 22-1994] (LJ) [Entered: 11/30/2022 11:17 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Daniel H. Silverman for Appellee End User Consumer Plaintiff Class has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [11] [7276052] [22-2889] (LJ) [Entered: 11/30/2022 11:07 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Rio S. Pierce for Appellee End User Consumer Plaintiff Class has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [10] [7276045] [22-2889] (LJ) [Entered: 11/30/2022 11:03 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Alison Deich for Appellee End User Consumer Plaintiff Class has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [9] [7275975] [22-2889] (LJ) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:51 AM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Benjamin D. Brown for Appellee End User Consumer Plaintiff Class has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [8] [7275966] [22-2889] (LJ) [Entered: 11/30/2022 09:42 AM]
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 6 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 12/19/2022 for John Andren. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/18/2023 for End User Consumer Plaintiff Class. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/08/2023 for Appellant John Andren. CDH [7] [7275797] [22-2889] (HTP) [Entered: 11/29/2022 01:03 PM]
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Motion filed by Appellant John Andren to extend time to file appellant brief. [6] [7275598] [22-2889] (Bednarz, Michael) [Entered: 11/28/2022 05:06 PM]
October 29, 2022 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney M. Frank Bednarz for Appellant John Andren. [5] [7269952] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2889] (Bednarz, Michael) [Entered: 10/29/2022 12:01 AM]
October 29, 2022 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John Andren. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7269951] [22-2889] (Bednarz, Michael) [Entered: 10/29/2022 12:00 AM]
October 28, 2022 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellant John Andren. [3] [7269950] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-2889]--[Edited 10/31/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Frank is added to the docket.] (Bednarz, Michael) [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:58 PM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Mar-Jac AL/MS, Inc, Mar-Jar Holdings, Inc., Mar-Jar Poultry AL, LLC, Mar-Jac Poultry MS, LLC, Mar-Jac, Poultry, LLC, Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc and Tyson Puultry, Inc.. [2] [7268707] [22-2889] (ER) [Entered: 10/25/2022 10:54 AM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John Andren by 10/28/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 11/07/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 12/05/2022 for John Andren. [1] [7268679] [22-2889] (ER) [Entered: 10/25/2022 10:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Andren v. End User Consumer Plaintiff Class
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: END USER CONSUMER PLAINTIFF CLASS
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Benjamin D. Brown
Represented By: Alison Deich
Represented By: Brent W. Johnson
Represented By: Rio S. Pierce
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Daniel H. Silverman
Represented By: Breanna Le Van Engelen
Represented By: Alison Sarah Deich
Represented By: Breanna Van Engelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOHN ANDREN, Objector
Represented By: Michael Frank Bednarz
Represented By: Theodore H. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDALE FARMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Aaron K. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE'S INC.
Represented By: Emily M. Asp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE'S FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Emily M. Asp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAR-JAC POULTRY, INC.
Represented By: Edward C. Konieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECO FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PILGRIM'S PRIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Alli G. Katzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TYSON FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?