LQD Business Finance, LLC v. AKF, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: LQD BUSINESS FINANCE, LLC
Defendant: AKF, INC., doing business as FUNDKITE, FUNDKITE, LLC, WORLD GLOBAL CAPITAL, LLC and YELLOWSTONE CAPITAL, LLC
Case Number: 24-1071
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 04/15/2024 for LQD Business Finance, LLC. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 05/15/2024 for AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, Azizuddin Rose, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 06/14/2024 for Appellant LQD Business Finance, LLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 07/05/2024 for Appellants AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC. JB [7362557] [23-2356, 24-1071] (AD) [Entered: 02/05/2024 12:02 PM]
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bevin Brennan for Appellants AKF, Inc., World Global Capital, LLC, FUNDKITE, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC. [7] [7361080] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1071] (Brennan, Bevin) [Entered: 01/26/2024 02:42 PM]
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants Appellee LQD Business Finance, LLC AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC in 24-1071. [6] [7360853] [24-1071, 23-2356]--[Edited 01/25/2024 by JAD to reflect the correct party filers] (Brennan, Bevin) [Entered: 01/25/2024 04:27 PM]
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellees Appellant LQD Business Finance, LLC AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC in 23-2356. [5] [7360823] [23-2356, 24-1071]--[Edited 01/25/2024 by JAD to reflect the correct party filers] (Brennan, Bevin) [Entered: 01/25/2024 03:37 PM]
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Main appeal brief due on or before 03/13/2024 for LQD Business Finance, LLC. Appellee Cross-Appellant brief due on or before 04/12/2024 for AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, Azizuddin Rose, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC. Appellant Reply Cross-Appellee brief due by 05/14/2024 for Appellant LQD Business Finance, LLC. Reply Brief in Cross Appeal due by 06/04/2024 for Appellants AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC. JB [7360539] [23-2356, 24-1071] (CG) [Entered: 01/24/2024 02:19 PM]
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday February 13, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [3] [7360533] [23-2356, 24-1071] (CG) [Entered: 01/24/2024 02:12 PM]
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. The briefing schedule is as follows: 1.Plaintiff shall file its opening brief and required short appendix in the main appeal docketed in 23-2356 on or before February 28, 2024. 2.Defendants shall file their combined responsive brief in the main appeal and opening brief and appendix in the cross-appeal docketed in 24-1071 on or before March 29, 2024. 3.Plaintiff shall file its combined reply brief, if any, in the main appeal and responsive brief in the cross-appeal on or before April 29, 2024. 4. Defendants shall file their reply brief, if any, in the cross-appeal on or before May 20, 2024. (See order for further details). DW [2] [7359525] [23-2356, 24-1071] (HTP) [Entered: 01/18/2024 04:37 PM]
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/31/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 02/26/2024 for AKF, Inc., FUNDKITE, LLC, World Global Capital, LLC and Yellowstone Capital, LLC [1] [7359336] [24-1071] (FP) [Entered: 01/18/2024 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: LQD Business Finance, LLC v. AKF, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LQD BUSINESS FINANCE, LLC
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKF, INC., doing business as FUNDKITE
Represented By: Bevin Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNDKITE, LLC
Represented By: Bevin Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD GLOBAL CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Bevin Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELLOWSTONE CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Bevin Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?