Welby Cox v. DOJ, et al
Plaintiff: WELBY THOMAS COX
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and ZACHARY AUGUSTUS MYERS, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 24-1606
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Welby Thomas Cox. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [7] [7386692] [24-1606] (DAB) [Entered: 06/06/2024 03:14 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 6 Appearance form filed by Attorney Shelese M. Woods for Appellees DOJ and Zachary Augustus Myers. [6] [7380956] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1606] [Edited 05/07/2024 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Woods, Shelese) [Entered: 05/07/2024 01:34 PM]
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On April 30, 2024, the District Court granted the plaintiffs motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Accordingly, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Welby Thomas Cox. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/02/2024 for Zachary Augustus Myers and United States Department of Justice. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/23/2024 for Appellant Welby Thomas Cox. VG [7380179] [24-1606] (AP) [Entered: 05/03/2024 10:31 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Welby Thomas Cox leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 04/30/2024. [4] [7379442] [24-1606] (CG) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:45 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Welby Thomas Cox leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 04/30/2024. [3] [7379437] [24-1606] (CG) [Entered: 04/30/2024 02:40 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Welby Thomas Cox. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7378426] [24-1606] (CAH) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:46 PM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Welby Thomas Cox by 04/18/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/29/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/29/2024 for Appellant Welby Thomas Cox. [1] [7376487] [24-1606] (CG) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Welby Cox v. DOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELBY THOMAS COX
Represented By: Welby Thomas Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Kelly Ann Rota
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZACHARY AUGUSTUS MYERS, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Kelly Ann Rota
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?