E. D., et al v. Noblesville School District, et al
Plaintiff: E. D., a minor, by next friend MICHAEL DUELL, LISA DUELL, as parent and next friend of E.D., MICHAEL DUELL, as parent and next friend of E.D. and NOBLESVILLE STUDENTS FOR LIFE
Defendant: NOBLESVILLE SCHOOL DISTRICT, NOBLESVILLE HIGH SCHOOL, BETH NIEDERMEYER, CRAIG MCCAFFREY and JANAE MOBLEY
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF IOWA, UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER, MANHATTAN INSTITUTE, CATHOLICVOTE.ORG EDUCATION FUND, FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW, YOUNG AMERICA'S FOUNDATION, STUDENTS FOR LIFE OF AMERICA and INDIANA FAMILY INSTITUTE
Case Number: 24-1608
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 31 Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae CatholicVote.org Education Fund per order. Paper copies due on 06/20/2024 [31] [7387812] [24-1608] (GW) [Entered: 06/13/2024 12:34 PM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 30 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Indiana Family Institute, Students for Life of America and Young America's Foundation per order. Paper copies due on 06/20/2024 [30] [7387794] [24-1608] (EF) [Entered: 06/13/2024 11:52 AM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 29 Amicus brief filed by Amicus Curiae Foundation for Moral Law, per order. Paper copies due on 06/20/2024 [29] [7387792] [24-1608] (DAB) [Entered: 06/13/2024 11:48 AM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 28 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae Manhattan Institute and Upper Midwest Law Center, per order. Paper copies due on 06/20/2024 [28] [7387777] [24-1608] (CAG) [Entered: 06/13/2024 11:23 AM]
June 13, 2024 Filing 27 Paper copies of amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Iowa and State of Kansas. [27] [7387776] [24-1608] (LJ) [Entered: 06/13/2024 11:20 AM]
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: 1. Motion for leave to file brief on behalf of prospective amici curiae Upper Midwest Law Center and Manhattan Institute in support of plaintiffs-appellants. 2. Motion of catholicvote.org education fund for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs-appellants and reversal. 3. Brief amicus curiae of the foundation for moral law in support of appellants. 4. Motion for leave to file brief as amici curiae by young Americas foundation, students for life of America, and Indiana family institute in support of plaintiffs-appellants opening brief. Upper Midwest Law Center and Manhattan Institutes motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered amicus brief. CatholicVote.org Education Funds motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered amicus brief. Foundation for Moral Laws motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered amicus brief. Young Americas Foundation, Students for Life of America, and Indiana Family Institutes motion is GRANTED. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered amicus brief. [ # 22 ] [ # 20 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 18 ] CMM [26] [7387770] [24-1608] (CG) [Entered: 06/13/2024 10:55 AM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 25 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the Amicus brief docket #24, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: STATE OF LOUISANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, and STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA [25] [7387318] [24-1608] (CAH) [Entered: 06/11/2024 11:23 AM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 24 Amicus brief filed by Amici Curiae State of Iowa, State of Indiana, State of Idaho, State of Georgia and State of Kansas government filing, no consent necessary. Paper copies due on 06/17/2024 [24] [7387315] [24-1608] (CAH) [Entered: 06/11/2024 11:20 AM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 23 Submitted brief by Joshua Hershberger for amicus Young America's Foundation, Students for Life of America, Indiana Family Institute. Leave granted by court order. [23] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7387232] [24-1608] (Hershberger, Joshua) [Entered: 06/10/2024 08:09 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 22 Motion filed by Joshua Hershberger to file Motion. brief as amici curiae by Young America's Foundation, Students for LIfe of America, and Indiana Family Institute in support of plaintiff-appellants' opening brief. [22] [7387231] [24-1608]--[Edited 06/11/2024 by CG to reflect correct document filed.] (Hershberger, Joshua) [Entered: 06/10/2024 08:00 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 21 Submitted brief by Anthony J. Powell for amicus Amicus Curiae States of Kansas, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Iowa, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and South Dakota. Federal or state filer (consent unnecessary). [21] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7387223] [24-1608] (Powell, Anthony) [Entered: 06/10/2024 04:47 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 20 Motion filed by Foundation for Moral Law to file amicus curiae brief. [20] [7387209] [24-1608] (Eidsmoe, John) [Entered: 06/10/2024 04:28 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 19 Motion filed by Foundation for Moral Law to file amicus curiae brief. [19] [7387132] [24-1608] (Eidsmoe, John) [Entered: 06/10/2024 03:08 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 18 Non-Party motion filed by CatholicVote.org Education Fund to file Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellants and Reversal. [18] [7387125] [24-1608] (Gaylord, Scott) [Entered: 06/10/2024 02:54 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 17 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John Eidsmoe for NON-PARTY Foundation for Moral Law. [17] [7387090] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608]--[Edited 06/10/2024 by ER - to reflect non-party.] (Eidsmoe, John) [Entered: 06/10/2024 01:47 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 16 Motion filed by Upper Midwest Law Center and Manhattan Institute to file Amicus Brief. [16] [7387057] [24-1608] (Dickey, James) [Entered: 06/10/2024 11:53 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 15 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [15] [7386775] [24-1608] (LJ) [Entered: 06/07/2024 09:55 AM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 14 Appellant's brief filed by Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. Paper copies due on 06/10/2024. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [14] [7385873] [24-1608] (EF) [Entered: 06/03/2024 01:12 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 13 Submitted appellant brief by Mathew W. Hoffmann for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7385857] [24-1608] (Hoffmann, Mathew) [Entered: 06/03/2024 11:59 AM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 12 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Zac Kester for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [12] [7384956] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608]--[Edited 05/28/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Kester, Zachary) [Entered: 05/28/2024 03:09 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Spencer E. Rehn for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [11] [7384867] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [24-1608] (Rehn, Spencer) [Entered: 05/28/2024 01:18 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Cassie N. Heeke for Appellees Craig McCaffrey, Janae Mobley, Beth Niedermeyer, Noblesville High School and Noblesville School District. for Jeremey Luna, Alexandra Snider Pasko, Alison Rootes, Allison Schwingendorf-Haley, Elizabeth Kizer, Emily Patterson-Jackson, Grace Tuesca, and Stephanie Eads. [10] [7379721] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [24-1608] (Heeke, Cassie) [Entered: 05/01/2024 02:57 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Liberty L. Roberts for Appellees Craig McCaffrey, Janae Mobley, Beth Niedermeyer, Noblesville High School and Noblesville School District. for Jeremy Luna, Alexandra Snider Pasko, Alison Rootes, Allison Schwingendorf-Haley, Elizabeth Kizer, Emily Patterson-Jackson, Grace Tuesca, and Stephanie Eads. [9] [7379305] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608] (Roberts, Liberty) [Entered: 04/30/2024 09:50 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [8] [7378284] [24-1608] (Hoffmann, Mathew) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:50 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Added Attorney Tyson C. Langhofer for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life, in case 24-1608 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Tyson C. Langhofer for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [7] [7378281] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Langhofer, Tyson) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:48 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Mathew Hoffmann for party(s) Appellant Michael Duell Appellant Noblesville Students for Life Appellant E. D. Appellant Lisa Duell, in case 24-1608 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Mathew W. Hoffmann for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [6] [7378273] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Hoffmann, Mathew) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:42 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) John J. Bursch for party(s) Appellant Michael Duell Appellant Noblesville Students for Life Appellant E. D. Appellant Lisa Duell, in case 24-1608 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John J. Bursch for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [5] [7378271] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1608]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bursch, John) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:38 AM]
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/05/2024 for Craig McCaffrey, Janae Mobley, Beth Niedermeyer, Noblesville High School and Noblesville School District. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/26/2024 for Appellants E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. RJS [7377052] [24-1608] (ER) [Entered: 04/17/2024 04:19 PM]
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone,Thursday May 2, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [3] [7377049] [24-1608] (ER) [Entered: 04/17/2024 04:15 PM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Daniel Swafford, Jeremy Luna, Alexandra Snider Pasko, Alison Rootes, Allison Schwingendorf-Haley, Elizabeth Kizer, Emily Patterson-Jackson, Grace Tuesca, and Stephanie Eads. [2] [7376504] [24-1608] (MAN) [Entered: 04/16/2024 10:01 AM]
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/29/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 05/28/2024 for E. D., Lisa Duell, Michael Duell and Noblesville Students for Life. [1] [7376492] [24-1608] (MAN) [Entered: 04/16/2024 09:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: E. D., et al v. Noblesville School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. D., a minor, by next friend MICHAEL DUELL
Represented By: Laura K. Buckner
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Mathew Hoffmann
Represented By: Zachary S. Kester
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA DUELL, as parent and next friend of E.D.
Represented By: Laura K. Buckner
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Mathew Hoffmann
Represented By: Zachary S. Kester
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DUELL, as parent and next friend of E.D.
Represented By: Laura K. Buckner
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Mathew Hoffmann
Represented By: Zachary S. Kester
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOBLESVILLE STUDENTS FOR LIFE
Represented By: Laura K. Buckner
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Mathew Hoffmann
Represented By: Zachary S. Kester
Represented By: Tyson Charles Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBLESVILLE SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Liberty Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBLESVILLE HIGH SCHOOL
Represented By: Liberty Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETH NIEDERMEYER
Represented By: Liberty Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG MCCAFFREY
Represented By: Liberty Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANAE MOBLEY
Represented By: Liberty Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Anthony J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UPPER MIDWEST LAW CENTER
Represented By: James V. F. Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MANHATTAN INSTITUTE
Represented By: Ilya Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLICVOTE.ORG EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Scott Gaylord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW
Represented By: John Allen Eidsmoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YOUNG AMERICA'S FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joshua Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STUDENTS FOR LIFE OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joshua Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INDIANA FAMILY INSTITUTE
Represented By: Joshua Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?