Andy Williams, Jr. v. City of Aurora, Illinois, et al
Plaintiff: ANDY H. WILLIAMS, JR.
Defendant: CITY OF AURORA, ILLINOIS, MAYOR RICHARD IRVIN AND THE CITY COUNCIL OF AURORA, KRISTEN ZIMAN, JEFFERY TATE, Sergeant and MATTHEW HUBER
Case Number: 24-1635
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 5 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 07/01/2024 for Andy H. Williams Jr. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/31/2024 for City of Aurora, Illinois, Matthew Huber, Mayor Richard Irvin and the City Council of Aurora, Jeffery Tate, Sergeant and Kristen Ziman. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/21/2024 for Appellant Andy H. Williams Jr. CDH [6] [7385620] [24-1635] (AP) [Entered: 05/31/2024 10:12 AM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 5 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Andy H. Williams, Jr. to extend time to file appellant's brief. [5] [7385517] [24-1635] (CAH) [Entered: 05/30/2024 02:59 PM]
May 2, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mr. Andy H. Williams, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7380008] [24-1635] (EF) [Entered: 05/02/2024 03:13 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John B. Murphey for Appellees City of Aurora, Illinois, Matthew Huber, Mayor Richard Irvin and the City Council of Aurora and Jeffery Tate. for Keith Cross, Timothy Young, Steve Martin, Antonio Piscopo. [3] [7379655] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1635] (Murphey, John) [Entered: 05/01/2024 12:18 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Timothy Young, Steve Martin, Antonio Piscopo, Andrew Martin, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Officer Badge #390, and Officer Badge #392. [2] [7377512] [24-1635] (HTP) [Entered: 04/19/2024 12:47 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Andy H. Williams Jr. by 04/25/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/03/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/29/2024 for Andy H. Williams Jr. [1] [7377505] [24-1635] (HTP) [Entered: 04/19/2024 12:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Andy Williams, Jr. v. City of Aurora, Illinois, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDY H. WILLIAMS, JR.
Represented By: Andy H. Williams Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF AURORA, ILLINOIS
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR RICHARD IRVIN AND THE CITY COUNCIL OF AURORA
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTEN ZIMAN
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY TATE, Sergeant
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW HUBER
Represented By: John B. Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?