John Couch v. City of Indianapolis, Indiana, et al
Plaintiff: JOHN L. COUCH
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA, JOSEPH HOGSETT, Mayor of Indianapolis, IN and UNIGOV, the colloquial name adopted by the city of Indianapolis, Indiana, to describe its consolidated city-county government
Case Number: 24-1644
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [6] [7386610] [24-1644] (AD) [Entered: 06/06/2024 12:48 PM]
June 6, 2024 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/06/2024 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7386614-2] [7386614] [24-1644] (AD) [Entered: 06/06/2024 12:57 PM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John L. Couch. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 24-1565, 24-1655 [5] [7382882] [24-1644] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2024 04:01 PM]
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant John L. Couch is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant John L. Couch by 05/20/2024. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 2321. [4] [7380625] [24-1644] (AD) [Entered: 05/06/2024 01:14 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant John L. Couch leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/23/2024. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/24/2024 for Appellant John L. Couch [7378358] [3] [7378358] [24-1644] (AP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 12:02 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 No attorney(s) added for Appellee Unigov, per District Court docket and information sheet. [2] [7377812] [24-1644] (AD) [Entered: 04/22/2024 02:28 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Transcript information sheet due by 05/03/2024. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John L. Couch by 04/19/2024. [1] [7377785] [24-1644] (AD) [Entered: 04/22/2024 12:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Couch v. City of Indianapolis, Indiana, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L. COUCH
Represented By: John L. Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, INDIANA
Represented By: Michael Brian Coppinger II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY, INDIANA
Represented By: Michael Brian Coppinger II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH HOGSETT, Mayor of Indianapolis, IN
Represented By: Michael Brian Coppinger II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIGOV, the colloquial name adopted by the city of Indianapolis, Indiana, to describe its consolidated city-county government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?