David Wilkerson v. Timothy Chamberlain, et al
Plaintiff: DAVID WILKERSON
Defendant: TIMOTHY CHAMBERLAIN, BESSIE DOMINGUEZ, Doctor, SUSAN TUELL and WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Case Number: 24-1645
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, all proceedings in this appeal are STAYED pending further court order. Counsel for the Appellant and Appellees are directed to make an electronic mail status report to the Circuit Mediation Office on 06/01/2024. This requirement may be satisfied by filing a motion under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) to dismiss the appeal. [7384349] [24-1645] (AD) [Entered: 05/24/2024 08:53 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Harry Dodsworth for Appellant David Wilkerson. [10] [7379662] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1645] --[Edited 05/01/2024 by AP- to reflect addition of counsel] (Dodsworth, Harry) [Entered: 05/01/2024 12:31 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jeffrey J. Escher for Appellees Timothy Chamberlain, Bessie Dominguez, Susan Tuell and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [9] [7378869] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1645]--[Edited 04/26/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Escher, Jeffrey) [Entered: 04/26/2024 12:36 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Robert S. Tengesdal for Appellees Timothy Chamberlain, Bessie Dominguez, Susan Tuell and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [8] [7378868] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1645] (Tengesdal, Robert) [Entered: 04/26/2024 12:32 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant David Wilkerson. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7378488] [24-1645] (Sultanian, Heather) [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:48 PM]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 06/17/2024 for David Wilkerson. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/17/2024 for Timothy Chamberlain, Bessie Dominguez, Doctor, Susan Tuell and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/07/2024 for Appellant David Wilkerson. RJS [7378470] [24-1645] (AP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 03:48 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Wednesday, May 15, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [5] [7378469] [24-1645] (AP) [Entered: 04/24/2024 03:46 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Andrew F. Rodheim for party(s) Appellant David Wilkerson, in case 24-1645 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew F. Rodheim [4] [7378425] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1645]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Rodheim, Andrew) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:44 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Leslie Kuhn-Thayer for Appellant David Wilkerson. [3] [7378400] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1645] (Kuhn-Thayer, Leslie) [Entered: 04/24/2024 01:22 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 Attorney Leslie Kuhn-Thayer for David Wilkerson in 24-1645 terminated and added Attorney(s) Heather Benzmiller Sultanian for party(s) Appellant David Wilkerson, in case 24-1645 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Heather Benzmiller Sultanian for Appellant David Wilkerson. [2] [7378399] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1645]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by AD to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Sultanian, Heather) [Entered: 04/24/2024 01:19 PM]
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant David Wilkerson by 04/26/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/03/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/29/2024 for David Wilkerson. [1] [7377686] [24-1645] (CG) [Entered: 04/22/2024 10:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Wilkerson v. Timothy Chamberlain, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WILKERSON
Represented By: Leslie Kuhn-Thayer
Represented By: Heather Benzmiller Sultanian
Represented By: Andrew F. Rodheim
Represented By: Harry B. Dodsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY CHAMBERLAIN
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Escher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BESSIE DOMINGUEZ, Doctor
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Escher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN TUELL
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Escher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Robert Steven Tengesdal
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Escher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?