Quality Custom Distribution v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 710
Petitioner: QUALITY CUSTOM DISTRIBUTION
Respondent: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL 710
Case Number: 24-1648
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 13, 2025 Summary Quality Custom Distribution Services LLC v International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 710

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Quality Custom Distribution. [5] [7380343] [24-1648] (Schiff, Matthew) [Entered: 05/03/2024 03:33 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory D. Wolflick, Esq. for Appellant Quality Custom Distribution. [4] [7380280] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1648] (Wolflick, Gregory) [Entered: 05/03/2024 01:53 PM]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/05/2024 for Quality Custom Distribution. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/05/2024 for International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 710. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/26/2024 for Appellant Quality Custom Distribution. JB [7378436] [24-1648] (PS) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:50 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Tuesday, June 4, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB [2] [7378431] [24-1648] (PS) [Entered: 04/24/2024 02:48 PM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/03/2024 for Quality Custom Distribution. [1] [7377778] [24-1648] (PS) [Entered: 04/22/2024 12:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Quality Custom Distribution v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 710
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QUALITY CUSTOM DISTRIBUTION
Represented By: Matthew B. Schiff
Represented By: Gregory D. Wolflick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, LOCAL 710
Represented By: Joseph Richardson
Represented By: Joseph Doolin Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?