John Couch v. State of Indiana, et al
Plaintiff: JOHN L. COUCH
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA, NOBLESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT, HAMILTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION and MIAMI CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Case Number: 24-1655
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Filing 8 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant John L. Couch. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 24-1565, 24-1644 [8] [7382879] [24-1655] (CAH) [Entered: 05/16/2024 03:58 PM]
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders appellant to show cause for his failure to respond to the court's order of April 23, 2024. Appellant shall file his response on or before May 28, 2024. Appellant is advised that failure to respond may result in the dismissal of this appeal. The clerk of this court shall attach a copy of the April 23, 2024, order to appellant's copy of this order. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 2383. JXK [7] [7382181] [24-1655] (AD) [Entered: 05/14/2024 10:40 AM]
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Appellant John L. Couch is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant John L. Couch by 05/20/2024. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7022 0410 0003 3396 2321. [6] [7380624] [24-1655] (AD) [Entered: 05/06/2024 01:11 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant John L. Couch leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 04/22/2024. Mr. Couch's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, dkt. [23], motion to change venue and injunctive relief request, dkt. [25], are denied. Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 30 day notice for failure to pay the docketing fee. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/23/2024 for Appellant John L. Couch. [7378093] [5] [7378093] [24-1655] (AP) [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:20 PM]
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Appellant John L. Couch shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be LIMITED to review of the March 15, 2024 order denying appellant's post-judgment motions. A notice of appeal filed before the district court issues its ruling on a timely motion under Rule 59 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is ineffective until the order disposing of the motion is entered on the district courts civil docket. Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). The appellant shall state in his brief memorandum, on or before May 6, 2024, why this appeal should not be STAYED pending the entry of the order disposing of the motion for injunctive relief. A motion for voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) will satisfy these requirements. Finally, briefing is SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details) [7377957] JXK [4] [7377957] [24-1655] (FP) [Entered: 04/23/2024 09:08 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7377751] (Note: The Office of the IN Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [24-1655] (MAN) [Entered: 04/22/2024 11:59 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Daniel J. Pfleging, David Najjar, Hamilton County Prosecutor Office, Hamilton County Sheriff, Hamilton County Jail Division, Steven Peter Stoesz, Fred Rice and Laura Johnson. [2] [7377749] [24-1655] (MAN) [Entered: 04/22/2024 11:58 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John L. Couch by 04/19/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/06/2024. [1] [7377743] [24-1655] (MAN) [Entered: 04/22/2024 11:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Couch v. State of Indiana, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN L. COUCH
Represented By: John L. Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBLESVILLE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?