Eddie Bolden v. Angelo Pesavento, et al
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. BOLDEN
Defendant: ANGELO PESAVENTO, JAMES OLIVER, ESTATE OF EDWARD SIWEK, ESTATE OF GEORGE KARL and CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 24-1674
Filed: April 23, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' briefs are due on or before 07/15/2024 for City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. Appellee's brief due on or before 08/14/2024 for Eddie L. Bolden. Appellants' reply briefs, if any, are due on or before 09/04/2024 for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. RJS [7384347] [24-1674] (FP) [Entered: 05/24/2024 08:46 AM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Blake J. Kolesa for Appellee Eddie L. Bolden. [11] [7379519] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1674] (Kolesa, Blake) [Entered: 04/30/2024 06:02 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Eli J. Litoff for Appellee Eddie L. Bolden. [10] [7379518] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1674] (Litoff, Eli) [Entered: 04/30/2024 06:00 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Matthew C. Crowl for Appellee Eddie L. Bolden. [9] [7379517] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1674]--[Edited 05/01/2024 by FP to reflect that atty. Crowl is added to the docket.] (Crowl, Matthew) [Entered: 04/30/2024 05:56 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Ronald S. Safer for Appellee Eddie L. Bolden. [8] [7379516] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1674] (Safer, Ronald) [Entered: 04/30/2024 05:54 PM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 7 Docketing Statement filed by Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7378867] [24-1674] (Henriques, Julian) [Entered: 04/26/2024 12:29 PM]
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellants' brief due on or before 06/14/2024 for City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/15/2024 for Eddie L. Bolden. Appellants' reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/05/2025 for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. RJS [7378467] [24-1674] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2024 03:42 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, May 14, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [5] [7378465] [24-1674] (ER) [Entered: 04/24/2024 03:34 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 Appearance form filed by Attorney SUZANNE M. LOOSE for Appellants Angelo Pesavento, James Oliver, Estate of George Karl, Estate of Edward Siwek and City of Chicago. [4] [7378267] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1674]--[Edited 04/24/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Loose, Suzanne) [Entered: 04/24/2024 09:29 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Appearance form filed by Attorney Julian N. Henriques, Jr. for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. [3] [7378151] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1674] -[Edited 04/23/2024 by ER - Terminated Attorneys Tiffany S. Fordyce and Brian John Stefanich. Added Attorney Julian N. Henriques, Jr.] (Henriques, Julian) [Entered: 04/23/2024 02:36 PM]
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellant represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellants are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellant's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7378115] [2] [7378115] [24-1674] (PS) [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:59 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento by 04/29/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/07/2024. Appellants' briefs due on or before 06/03/2024 for City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. [1] [7378105] [24-1674] (PS) [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Eddie Bolden v. Angelo Pesavento, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDDIE L. BOLDEN
Represented By: Eli J. Litoff
Represented By: Matthew Charles Crowl
Represented By: Blake James Kolesa
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELO PESAVENTO
Represented By: Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES OLIVER
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Represented By: Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF EDWARD SIWEK
Represented By: Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF GEORGE KARL
Represented By: Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
Represented By: Suzanne M. Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?