Kenneth Cowles, III v. USA, et al
Plaintiff: KENNETH D. COWLES, III
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, STATE OF INDIANA, OFFICE OF THE INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL and ERIC J. HOLCOMB, Governor of Indiana
Case Number: 24-1689
Filed: April 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This cause is DISMISSED pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Mandate issued, no record to be returned. [11] [7386899] [24-1689] (AD) [Entered: 06/07/2024 04:03 PM]
June 7, 2024 FOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 06/07/2024 Final Order with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk. [7386903-2] [7386903] [24-1689] (AD) [Entered: 06/07/2024 04:10 PM]
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: 1) Notice of Petition for Review [ # 6 ]. 2) Notice of Petition for Permission to Appeal [ # 7 ]. 3) Notice of Motion of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit [ # 8 ]. The petitions and motion for leave to appeal are DENIED as unnecessary. Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III timely appealed from the district courts 04/22/2024, order dismissing his case, and does not need additional permission to appeal. CMM [10] [7384165] [24-1689] (MAN) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:08 AM]
May 16, 2024 Filing 9 Issued Circuit Rule 3(b) 14 day notice to file a motion for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or pay the docketing fee in the District Court. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/30/2024 for Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles III. [9] [7382633] [24-1689] (AD) [Entered: 05/16/2024 09:14 AM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 Filed copy of Motion of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, along with copy of exhibits submitted on CD to the District Court, by Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III.[8] [7378712] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:56 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 7 Filed Petition for Permission to Appeal by Appellant Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III. [7] [7378709] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:54 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 6 Filed Petition for Review by Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III. [6] [7378705] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:52 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 5 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Pro Se Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III. [5] [7378702] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:48 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles, III. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7378701] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:46 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 3 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7378697] (Note: The Office of the US Attorney and the Office of the IN Attorney General have been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:40 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: County of St. Joseph Board of Commissioners, Carl H. Baxmeyer, Derek D. Dieter, Deborah A. Fleming, City of South Bend, James Mueller, Pete Buttigieg, South Bend City Attorney, St. Joseph County Jail, St. Joseph County Prosecutor's Office, Kenneth P. Cotter, St. Joseph County Superior Court, Judge Elizabeth C. Hurley, St. Joseph County Superior Court (Small Claims Division), St. Joseph County Probation Office, St. Joseph County Superior Judge, Kenneth Biggins, Judge Eric Tamashasky, Peter Britton, Officer Lindsey Summer, Officer Staton Brock, Officer Maranda Baker, Sheriff William Redman, Former Sheriff John Dow, Warden Olmstead Tillsoy, Captain Zauishauski, Indian Spring Apartments, Jasmin Williams, Gerald L. Shidaker, Sharron Nesbitt, Sharron Nesbitts Brother John Doe Number One, John Doe Number Two, Walmart, Meijer, Dollar General, Burger King, Good Will, Belmont Beverage, Afghanistan, Albania, Algeria, Andorra, Angola, Antigua, Argentina, Armenia, Australia, Austria, Azerbaijan, The Bahamas, Bahrain, Bangladesh, Barbados, Belarus, Belgium, Belize, Benin, Bhutan, Bolivia, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Botswana, Brazil, Brunei, Bulgaria, Burkina Faso, Burundi, Cambodia, Cameroon, Canada, Cabo Verde, Central African Republic, Chad, Chile, China, Colombia, Comoros, Democratic Republic of the Congo, Cook Islands, Costa Rica, C te d'Ivoire, Croatia, Cuba, Cyprus, Czech Republic, Denmark, Djibouti, Dominica, Ecuador, Egypt, El Salvador, Equatorial Guinea, Eritrea, Estonia, Ethiopia, Fiji, Finland, France, Gabon, The Gambia, Georgia, Germany, Ghana, Greece, Grenada, Guatemala, Guinea, Guinea-Bissau, Haiti, The Holy See, Honduras, Hungary, Iceland, India, Indonesia, Iran, Iraq, Ireland, Israel, Italy, Jamaica, Japan, Jordan, Kazakhstan, Kenya, Kiribati, Kuwait, Kyrgyzstan, Laos, Latvia, Lebanon, Lesotho, Liberia, Libya, Liechtenstein, Lithuania, Luxembourg, North Korea, South Korea, Federated States of Micronesia, Malawi, Malaysia, Maldives, Mali, Malta, Marshall Islands, Mauritania, Mauritius, Mexico, Moldova, Monaco, Mongolia, Montenegro, Morocco, Mozambique, Myanmar, Namibia, Nauru, Nepal, Netherlands, New Zealand, Nicaragua, Niger, Nigeria, Norway, Oman, Pakistan, Palau, Panama, Papua New Guinea, Paraguay, Peru, Phillippines, Poland, Portugal, Qatar, Romania, Rwanda, Palestine, Saint Kitts and Nevis, S o Tom and Pr ncipe, Saint Lucia, Saint Vincent and the Grenadines, Samoa, San Marino, Saudi Arabia, Senegal, Serbia, Seychelles, Sierra Leone, Singapore, Slovenia, Solomon Islands, South Africa, South Sudan, Soviet Union, Spain, Sri Lanka, Sudan, Suriname, Sweden, Switzerland, Syria, Tajikistan, Tanzania, Thailand, Timor-Leste, Trinidad and Tobago, Togo, Tonga, Trinidad, Tunisia, T rkiye, Turkmenistan, Tuvalu, Uganda, Ukraine, United Arab Emirates, United Kingdom, Uruguay, Uzbekistan, Vanuatu, Venezuela, Vietnam, Yemen, Zambia, and Zimbabwe. [2] [7378690] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:31 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 05/08/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/08/2024 for Appellant Kenneth D. Cowles III. [1] [7378656] [24-1689] (PS) [Entered: 04/25/2024 02:26 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenneth Cowles, III v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH D. COWLES, III
Represented By: Kenneth D. Cowles III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC J. HOLCOMB, Governor of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?