Kayla Heidelberg v. City of Peoria, Illinois, et al
Plaintiff: KAYLA HEIDELBERG, Administrator of the Estate of Cleve Heidelberg, Jr.
Defendant: CITY OF PEORIA, ILLINOIS, LARRY BERNARD, EMANUEL MANIAS, RONALD L. HAMM, COUNTY OF PEORIA, ILLINOIS, HOLLI BAIN, as the Independent Executor of the Estate of Paul Hibser, ROBERT WATSON, JR., as the Independent Administrator of the Estate of Robert Lee Watson and DAVID WENTWORTH, II, as the Independent Administrator for the Estates of Kenneth DeCremer, Williard Koeppel, Nolan Macklin, John Sack, and William Schalk; as the Independent Administrator for the Estate of Paul Hilst
Case Number: 24-1706
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2024 for Kayla Heidelberg. Appellees' brief due on or before 10/23/2024 for Holli Bain, Larry Bernard, City of Peoria, Illinois, County of Peoria, Illinois, Ronald L. Hamm, Emanuel Manias, Robert Watson Jr. and David Wentworth II. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2024 for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. JB [7389394] [24-1706] (FP) [Entered: 06/24/2024 09:23 AM]
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 Supplemental record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 1 flash drive of exhibits;. [13] [7386829] [24-1706] (FI) [Entered: 06/07/2024 12:18 PM]
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/29/2024 for Kayla Heidelberg. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/28/2024 for Holli Bain, Larry Bernard, City of Peoria, Illinois, County of Peoria, Illinois, Ronald L. Hamm, Emanuel Manias, Robert Watson Jr. and David Wentworth II. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/18/2024 for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. JB [7384807] [24-1706] (FP) [Entered: 05/28/2024 11:47 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 11 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Andrew M. Hale for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. [11] [7382289] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706] (Hale, Andrew) [Entered: 05/14/2024 02:44 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 10 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Kay L. Dawson for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. [10] [7382225] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706]--[Edited 05/14/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Simon, Rachel) [Entered: 05/14/2024 12:19 PM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Rachel Ellen Simon for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. [9] [7382224] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706]--[Edited 05/14/2024 by PS - to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Simon, Rachel) [Entered: 05/14/2024 12:18 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 8 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Amy Hijjawi for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. [8] [7381627] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706] [Edited 05/10/2024 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Hijjawi, Amy) [Entered: 05/10/2024 02:11 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 7 Added Attorney Thomas J. Sotos for Appellees Larry Bernard, Emanuel Manias, County of Peoria, Illinois, Holli Bain, Robert Watson, Jr., David Wentworth, II and City of Peoria, Illinois, in case 24-1706 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas J. Sotos for Appellees City of Peoria, Illinois, Larry Bernard, Emanuel Manias, County of Peoria, Illinois, Holli Bain, Robert Watson, Jr. and David Wentworth, II. [7] [7381607] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706]--[Edited 05/10/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Sotos, Thomas) [Entered: 05/10/2024 12:14 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Laura M. Ranum for Appellees City of Peoria, Illinois, Larry Bernard, Emanuel Manias, County of Peoria, Illinois, Holli Bain, Robert Watson, Jr. and David Wentworth, II. [6] [7381604] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706] (Ranum, Laura) [Entered: 05/10/2024 12:12 PM]
May 10, 2024 Filing 5 Added Attorney James G. Sotos for Appellees City of Peoria, Illinois, Larry Bernard, Emanuel Manias, County of Peoria, Illinois, Holli Bain, Robert Watson, Jr. and David Wentworth, II, in case 24-1706 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James G. Sotos for Appellees Larry Bernard, Emanuel Manias, County of Peoria, Illinois, Holli Bain, Robert Watson, Jr., David Wentworth, II and City of Peoria, Illinois. [5] [7381597] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1706]--[Edited 05/10/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Sotos, James) [Entered: 05/10/2024 12:10 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 4 Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. [4] [7381459] [24-1706] (Hale, Andrew) [Entered: 05/09/2024 03:05 PM]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/15/2024 for Kayla Heidelberg. Appellees' brief due on or before 08/14/2024 for Holli Bain, Larry Bernard, City of Peoria, Illinois, County of Peoria, Illinois, Ronald L. Hamm, Emanuel Manias, Robert Watson Jr. and David Wentworth II. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 09/04/2024 for Appellant Kayla Heidelberg. JB [7379576] [24-1706] (HTP) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:08 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted via Zoom, Friday, June 14, 2024 at 2:00pm. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. JB. [2] [7379572] [24-1706] (HTP) [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:05 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/10/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/05/2024 for Kayla Heidelberg. [1] [7378941] [24-1706] (AD) [Entered: 04/26/2024 03:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kayla Heidelberg v. City of Peoria, Illinois, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA HEIDELBERG, Administrator of the Estate of Cleve Heidelberg, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew M. Hale
Represented By: Kay L. Dawson
Represented By: Amy A. Hijjawi
Represented By: Rachel Ellen Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PEORIA, ILLINOIS
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY BERNARD
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMANUEL MANIAS
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD L. HAMM
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF PEORIA, ILLINOIS
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLI BAIN, as the Independent Executor of the Estate of Paul Hibser
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WATSON, JR., as the Independent Administrator of the Estate of Robert Lee Watson
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID WENTWORTH, II, as the Independent Administrator for the Estates of Kenneth DeCremer, Williard Koeppel, Nolan Macklin, John Sack, and William Schalk; as the Independent Administrator for the Estate of Paul Hilst
Represented By: Laura M. Ranum
Represented By: James G. Sotos
Represented By: Thomas J. Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?