Joseph Delarosa v. Village of Romeoville, et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DELAROSA
Defendant: VILLAGE OF ROMEOVILLE, BRANT HROMADKA and MIKE RYAN
Case Number: 24-1715
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 7 Appearance form filed by Attorney G. David Mathues for Appellant Mr. Joseph Delarosa and Appellees Brant Hromadka, Mike Ryan and Village of Romeoville. [7] [7389339] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1715] [Edited 06/24/2024 by CG to reflect correct attorney/party representation, and the addition of counsel.] (Mathues, Glenn) [Entered: 06/21/2024 03:29 PM]
June 21, 2024 Filing 6 Appearance form filed by Attorney Michael D. Bersani for Appellant Mr. Joseph Delarosa and Appellees Brant Hromadka, Mike Ryan and Village of Romeoville. [6] [7389336] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1715]--[Edited 06/24/2024 by FP to reflect this atty. represents only the appellees.] (Bersani, Michael) [Entered: 06/21/2024 03:27 PM]
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: Appellant's motion for electronic filing of all papers. The motion is GRANTED. Appellant Joseph Delarosa is granted leave to use the Electronic Case Filing system for filing material in this appeal. This courts Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuits web site: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate the pro se litigants filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of the litigants pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. [ # 4 ] CMM [5] [7387461] [24-1715] (HTP) [Entered: 06/11/2024 05:06 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Delarosa for electronic filing of all papers. [4] [7387071] [24-1715] (CAH) [Entered: 06/10/2024 12:30 PM]
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 15 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Delarosa. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/10/2024 for Brant Hromadka, Mike Ryan and Village of Romeoville. REMINDER: If a case is designated to proceed to oral argument, hearing notices will be mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at https://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [3] [7387070] [24-1715] (CAH) [Entered: 06/10/2024 12:29 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Mr. Joseph Delarosa. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [7380154] [24-1715] (EF) [Entered: 05/03/2024 09:45 AM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Joseph Delarosa by 05/06/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2024 for Joseph Delarosa [1] [7379134] [24-1715] (ER) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Delarosa v. Village of Romeoville, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DELAROSA
Represented By: Joseph Delarosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VILLAGE OF ROMEOVILLE
Represented By: Michael D. Bersani
Represented By: Glenn David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANT HROMADKA
Represented By: Michael D. Bersani
Represented By: Glenn David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE RYAN
Represented By: Michael D. Bersani
Represented By: Glenn David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?