Titus Henderson v. Matthew Frank, et al
Plaintiff: TITUS HENDERSON
Defendant: MATTHEW FRANK, JONNI SHANNON-SHARPE, SARA MASON, DAVID GARDNER and LEBBEUS BROWN
Case Number: 24-1756
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is pending. [4] [7388610] [24-1758, 24-1756, 24-1757, 24-1759, 24-1760, 24-1761] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2024 10:35 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 3 Attorney Annie V. Petering for Appellees Sara Mason, David Gardner, Jonni Shannon-Sharpe, Lebbeus Brown and Matthew Frank in 24-1756 terminated and added Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellees Sara Mason, David Gardner, Jonni Shannon-Sharpe, Lebbeus Brown and Matthew Frank, in case 24-1756 per appearance form. Appearance form filed by Attorney Jody J. Schmelzer for Appellees Sara Mason, David Gardner, Jonni Shannon-Sharpe, Lebbeus Brown and Matthew Frank. Additional Parties: Lynda Schwandt, Jerome Sweeney, Ellen Ray, Stacey Hoem, Rick Rawmisch, Anthony Meli, Bret Mierzejewski. [3] [7382506] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [24-1756]--[Edited 05/15/2024 by MAN to reflect substitution of counsel] (Schmelzer, Jody) [Entered: 05/15/2024 01:52 PM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Stacey Hoem, Ellen Ray, Anthony Meli, Bret Mierzejewski, Jerome Sweeney, Linda Schwandt, Rick Raemisch. [2] [7379849] [24-1756] (CG) [Entered: 05/02/2024 10:04 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Titus Henderson by 05/08/2024. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 05/31/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/15/2024. [1] [7379837] [24-1756] (CG) [Entered: 05/02/2024 09:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Titus Henderson v. Matthew Frank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TITUS HENDERSON
Represented By: Titus Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW FRANK
Represented By: Annie V. Petering
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONNI SHANNON-SHARPE
Represented By: Annie V. Petering
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA MASON
Represented By: Annie V. Petering
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GARDNER
Represented By: Annie V. Petering
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEBBEUS BROWN
Represented By: Annie V. Petering
Represented By: Jody J. Schmelzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?