Charles Lewis, Sr., et al v. Matthias Elson
Plaintiff: CHARLES LEWIS, SR. and MARIANNE LEWIS
Defendant: MATTHIAS ELSON
Case Number: 24-1807
Filed: May 9, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 7 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Dean A. Strang for Appellees Charles Lewis, Sr. and Marianne Lewis. [7] [7383135] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1807] (Strang, Dean) [Entered: 05/17/2024 03:35 PM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James Odell for Appellees Charles Lewis, Sr. and Marianne Lewis. [6] [7383015] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [24-1807] (Odell, James) [Entered: 05/17/2024 11:05 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 5 Added Attorney John H. Bradley for Appellees Charles Lewis, Sr. and Marianne Lewis, in case 24-1807 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney John H. Bradley for Appellees Charles Lewis, Sr. and Marianne Lewis. [5] [7383013] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1807]--[Edited 05/17/2024 by MAN to reflect addition of counsel] (Bradley, John) [Entered: 05/17/2024 11:02 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 4 Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Samuel C. Hall, Jr. for Appellant Matthias Elson. [4] [7382535] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [24-1807] [4] [7382535] [24-1807]--[Edited 05/15/2024 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Hall, Samuel) [Entered: 05/15/2024 02:39 PM]
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 07/01/2024 for Matthias Elson. Appellees' brief due on or before 07/31/2024 for Charles Lewis Sr. and Marianne Lewis. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/21/2024 for Appellant Matthias Elson. RJS [7382408] [24-1807] (HTP) [Entered: 05/15/2024 10:26 AM]
May 15, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Friday, May 31, 2024 at 9:30am. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [2] [7382403] [24-1807] (HTP) [Entered: 05/15/2024 10:24 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/23/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/18/2024 for Matthias Elson. [1] [7381532] [24-1807] (FP) [Entered: 05/10/2024 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Lewis, Sr., et al v. Matthias Elson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES LEWIS, SR.
Represented By: Dean Arthur Strang
Represented By: John H. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANNE LEWIS
Represented By: Dean Arthur Strang
Represented By: John H. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHIAS ELSON
Represented By: Timothy M. Johnson
Represented By: Samuel C. Hall Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?